Morales Renteral v. JNB Transport, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alejandro Morales Renteral
Defendant: JNB Transport, LLC, Blue Freight Logistics, Inc. and Luis Orlando Gutierrez-Guevara
Case Number: 2:2023cv02191
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Kansas City Office
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2023 at 11:00 AM (central time) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participants must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference deadline 7/13/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order due to chambers by 7/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/15/2023. (byk)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Blue Freight Logistics, Inc., Luis Orlando Gutierrez-Guevara, JNB Transport, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted A, #2 Exhibit B)(McMaster, Kevin)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Blue Freight Logistics, Inc., Luis Orlando Gutierrez-Guevara, JNB Transport, LLC (McMaster, Kevin)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Freight Logistics, Inc., Luis Orlando Gutierrez-Guevara, JNB Transport, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (McMaster, Kevin)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: The Court received notice by email that the parties have resolved the preservation issue, and Plaintiff is withdrawing the motion for a temporary injunction. The In Court Hearing scheduled for 6/14/23 is therefore, cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(2) and with the consent of Defendants, the court extends the #9 Temporary Restraining Order (TRO)--temporarily enjoining and restraining Defendants from destroying, deleting or altering, and ordering Defendants to preserve, all items, documents, information and ESI listed in the TRO in their possession, custody, or control--until 6/14/2023. A Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for 6/14/2023 at 01:30 PM in Topeka Courtroom 401 (TC) before District Judge Toby Crouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/18/2023. (byk)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: STATUS HEARING re TRO held on 5/16/2023. Written Order will follow. (byk)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kevin M. McMaster on behalf of All Defendants (McMaster, Kevin)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Deposit Security for TRO With the Court. Plaintiff is authorized to deposit the sum of One Thousand Dollars ($1,000) with the Clerk of Court as security for the TRO in lieu of a surety bond. The Clerk shall deposit the funds into an interest-bearing account with the Court Registry Investment System ("CRIS") or any other type of interest bearing account that is utilized by the Court. These funds, together with any interest and income earned thereon shall be held in the interest bearing account until further order of the Court. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1914 and the guidelines set by the Director of the Administrative Office of the United States Courts, the Clerk is directed, without further order of this Court, to deduct from the income earned on the money in the Fund a fee equal to ten percent of the income earned on the Fund. Such fee shall not exceed that authorized by the Judicial Conference of the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/8/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Order Authorizing Plaintiff to Deposit Cash Security for TRO with the Court by Plaintiff Alejandro Morales Renteral (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Turner, Patrick)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order RECEIPT for Cash Security for TRO per 13 in the amount of $1000.00, receipt #600002065. (jk)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Deadline to Post a Bond. For good cause shown, Plaintiff is hereby granted an extension until 5:00 PM on Monday, May 8, 2023, in which to give security for the #9 Temporary Restraining Order by posting a bond in the amount of $1,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/5/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hmg)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to post the bond required by the Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Alejandro Morales Renteral (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wilson, Jeffrey)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff shall give security for this TRO by posting a bond in the amount of $1,000 on or before 5/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/4/2023. (byk)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Hearing set for 5/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference - Zoom before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. (yh)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: regarding #3 Motion for TRO; MOTION HEARING held on 5/3/2023 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alejandro Morales Renteral. Plaintiff is ordered file a $1.000.00 Security Bond by Friday, May 5, 2023 to the Clerk of the Court. Follow-up hearing set May 16, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom.(Tape #Zoom.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Written Order will follow. (yh).
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CHANGING TIME OF HEARING on #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2023 will be held at 04:00 PM by Video Conference - Zoom before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/2/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(byk)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Zoom Video Conference: Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2023 at 11:30 AM by Video Conference - Zoom before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Counsel shall login using the following Zoom information: Meeting ID: 160 679 4821Passcode: 223015Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 964 1167 US (US Spanish Line) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 415 449 4000 US (US Spanish Line)Meeting ID: 160 679 4821Passcode: 223015Find your local number: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/aezd397D00 Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/2/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(tvn)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Hearing on #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2023 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participants must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/2/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blue Freight Logistics, Inc., Luis Orlando Gutierrez-Guevara, JNB Transport, LLC (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Alejandro Morales Renteral (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Wilson, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Alejandro Morales Renteral. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6048904.), filed by Alejandro Morales Renteral. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales Renteral v. JNB Transport, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Morales Renteral
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Wilson
Represented By: Patrick A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNB Transport, LLC
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Freight Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Orlando Gutierrez-Guevara
Represented By: Kevin M. McMaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?