Crossland Construction Company, Inc. v. Stephenson Dirt Contracting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Crossland Construction Company, Inc.
Defendant: Stephenson Dirt Contracting, LLC and Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv02236
Filed: May 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 8/24/2023. Mediation deadline 9/22/2023. Discovery deadline 11/13/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2023 at 10:00 AM by Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Dispositive motion deadline 1/12/2024. The parties expect the jury trial of this case to take approximately 4 to 5 trial days. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2024 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom (TBD) before District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/13/2023. (ca)
July 13, 2023 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/13/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Tanner B. France for Crossland Construction Company, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only and granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert L. Magrini for Crossland Construction Company, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/11/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
July 11, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Robert Magrini to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6102232.) by Plaintiff Crossland Construction Company, Inc. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Sagehorn, Kip)
July 11, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Tanner France to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6102223.) by Plaintiff Crossland Construction Company, Inc. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell.) (Sagehorn, Kip)
July 6, 2023 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Rule 26 by Crossland Construction Company, Inc. (Sagehorn, Kip) Modified title to remove repeated words on 7/6/2023 (ca).
July 3, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company of Initial Disclosures. (Woolf, John)
June 30, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Stephenson Dirt Contracting, LLC. (Baker, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as corporate parent. (Woolf, John)
June 14, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Woolf, John)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Order of Recusal, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Assignment Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court Proof of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court Return of Service, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Court Entry of Appearance, #9 Exhibit 9 - State Court Clerk's Extension, #10 Exhibit 10 - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit 11 - State Court Docket Sheet)(Woolf, John)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 02:30 PM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/22/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/3/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 7/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/6/2023. (ht)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The court ordered Defendant Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company to show cause why the court should not recommend that the district judge remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction--namely, because Charter Oak's notice of removal did not allege facts sufficient to show complete diversity of citizenship between the parties. (ECF 7.) Charter Oak has now responded to the order to show cause. (ECF 9.) After reviewing the response, the court is satisfied that Charter Oak has sufficiently alleged facts that the parties are completely diverse for subject matter jurisdiction purposes under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/6/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ht)
June 6, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #7 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Articles of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit 2 - Annual Report, #3 Exhibit 3 - Photo of Crossland)(Woolf, John)
May 31, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Stephenson Dirt Contracting, LLC. (Baker, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The court orders Charter Oak to show cause in writing by June 9, 2023, why the court should not recommend that the district judge remand this case for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Any response to this show-cause order must point to factual allegations that, if true, would establish complete diversity of citizenship. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/26/2023. (jal)
May 26, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Designation of Place of Trial, Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal, Order Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Woolf, John)
May 25, 2023 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 06/14/2023 for Defendant Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 05/25/2023. (nao)
May 24, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice Filing of Notice of Removal by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Woolf, John)
May 24, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Woolf, John)
May 24, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Woolf, John)
May 24, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cherokee County, Kansas, Case Number CK-2023-CV-000032, Trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6068939.), filed by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Consent, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit) (Woolf, John)
May 24, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crossland Construction Company, Inc. v. Stephenson Dirt Contracting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crossland Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kip C. Sagehorn
Represented By: Robert L. Magrini
Represented By: Tanner B. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephenson Dirt Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: John P. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?