International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO v. Baca et al
Defendant: Timothy Simmons
Counter Defendant: International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO, William B. Creeden, Kateryna Jones and Newton B. Jones
Counter Claimant: J. Tom Baca, Arnie Stadnick and John T. Fultz
Interested Party: Boilermakers for Change
Case Number: 2:2023cv02250
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION to Intervene by Interested Party Boilermakers for Change (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Barnhill, Curtis)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER finding as moot #38 Motion to Strike because Defendants later filed an Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/26/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sn)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Failure to File Opposition by J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick re #31 Counterclaim, #27 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #30 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #28 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #29 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #32 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Salva, Raymond)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Third Party Defendant ANSWER to #35 Third Party Complaint, #55 Counterclaim , ANSWER to #35 Third Party Complaint, #55 Counterclaim by Kateryna Jones.(Martens, Phillip)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Phillip Reed Martens on behalf of Kateryna Jones. (Martens, Phillip)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Third Party Defendant ANSWER to #35 Third Party Complaint, #55 Counterclaim , ANSWER to #35 Third Party Complaint, #55 Counterclaim by Newton B. Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martens, Phillip)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWER to #55 Counterclaim by William B. Creeden.(Bath, Thomas)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PROVISIONALLY SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #40 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Plaintiff by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick(Salva, Raymond)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 PROVISIONALLY SEALED EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #40 Reply to Response to Motion, of Plaintiff by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick(Salva, Raymond)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REDACTION to #42 PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits in Support of Response/Reply, by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Seal or Redact #41 and #42 Provisionally Sealed Exhibits in Support of Reply. The motion requested that the provisionally sealed document remain under seal and that a redacted version be filed in the public record. The motion is granted. Counsel who provisionally filed the document under seal is directed to file the redacted document, Doc #42 , in the public record forthwith using the Redacted Document event. The provisionally sealed document will remain sealed and the clerk is directed to remove the provisional designation from the entry. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/18/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Librado Arreola, Michael J. McGuire for William B. Creeden pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only; granting #72 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Librado Arreola, Michael J. McGuire for William B. Creeden pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Entered by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 07/18/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (nao)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION for attorney Michael McGuire to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6107867.) by Third Party Defendant/Counter Defendant William B. Creeden. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bath, Thomas)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for attorney Librado Arreola to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6107863.) by Third Party Defendant/Counter Defendant William B. Creeden. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bath, Thomas)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Bath, Jr on behalf of William B. Creeden (Bath, Thomas)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Scott L. Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brown, Scott)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting the parties' #67 Stipulation MOTION to Extend Time for Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant IBB to file its answer to the First Amended Counterclaim. Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant IBB is hereby granted an extension of time, up to and including 8/3/2023, in which to file its answer to the #55 First Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 7/17/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #35 Third Party Complaint by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Salva, Raymond)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Samuel Gladney for Newton B. Jones, pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Entered by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 07/11/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (nao)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION for attorney Samuel Gladney to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6102434.) by Counter Defendant/Third Party Defendant Newton B. Jones. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form) (Martens, Phillip) Modified on 7/11/2023 to remove repeated text. (ca)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Phillip Reed Martens on behalf of Newton B. Jones. (Martens, Phillip)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RETURN OF SERVICE of First Amended Counterclaim upon Third Party Defendant Kateryna Jones. (Salva, Raymond) Modified filers on 7/11/2023. (msb)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RETURN OF SERVICE of First Amended Counterclaim upon Third Party Defendant Newton B. Jones. (Salva, Raymond) Modified filers on 7/11/2023. (msb)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RETURN OF SERVICE of First Amended Counterclaim upon Third Party Defendant William B. Creeden. (Salva, Raymond) Modified filers on 7/11/2023. (msb)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena executed upon Third Party Defendant Newton B. Jones on 07/04/2023 by Personal Service. (Salva, Raymond) Modified text on 7/11/2023. (msb)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by John T. Fultz upon Kateryna Jones served on 7/4/2023, answer due 7/25/2023. (Salva, Raymond) Modified filer on 7/11/2023. (msb)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by John T. Fultz upon Newton B. Jones served on 7/4/2023, answer due 7/25/2023. (Salva, Raymond) Modified filer on 7/11/2023. (msb)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by John T. Fultz upon William B. Creeden served on 7/1/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Salva, Raymond) Modified filer on 7/11/2023. (msb)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #38 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #31 Counterclaim, #35 Third Party Complaint. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (byk)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against William B. Creeden, Kateryna Jones, Newton B. Jones, filed by Timothy Simmons, John T. Fultz, J. Tom Baca, Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ANSWER to #4 First Amended Complaint by J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond) Modified title on 7/3/2023. (ca)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Third Party Defendant William B. Creeden, Kateryna Jones, Newton B. Jones (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF COURTROOM CHANGE. Injunction Hearing scheduled for 7/27/2023 at 1:00 p.m. will be held in KCK Courtroom 427. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Seal or Redact #28 -5 Declaration of Timothy Simmons at 70-84 (Legal Memorandum). Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/22/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing set for 7/27/2023 at 01:00 PM in KC Courtroom (Unknown) before Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren. (cm)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 INTERIM PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #5 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #33 ) is granted in part and denied in part. See Order for details. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/22/2023. (mam)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held 6/20/2023 before Judge Eric F Melgren, Court Reporter Nancy Wiss, 913-735-2354, nancy_wiss@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Raymond Salva, Jr.. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2023. (nw)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren: MOTION HEARING held on 6/20/2023 re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Court Reporter Nancy Wiss.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STRIKING re #40 Reply to Response to Motion, filed without permission with excess pages. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/20/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying #37 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/20/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STATEMENT by Rank & File IBB Members in Support of the Recent Removal of Newton Jones from Office by Interested Party Boilermakers for Change. (Barnhill, Curtis)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #44 MOTION to Seal or Redact Document(s) #41 and #42 PROVISIONALLY SEALED Exhibits in Support of Response/Reply. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(byk)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Curtis G. Barnhill on behalf of Boilermakers for Change. (Barnhill, Curtis)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Declaration and Exhibit re #41 and #42 Provisionally Sealed Exhibits in Support of Replies by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF PROPOSED SEALED RECORD by All Plaintiffs re #41 and #42 Provisionally Sealed Exhibits in Support of Replies. (Amash, Michael)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SEALED EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT of #40 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2023 to remove the provisional designation per 74. (mam)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SEALED EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT of #40 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael) Modified on 7/19/2023 to remove the provisional designation per 74. (mam)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (STRICKEN per 48) -- REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19)(Amash, Michael) Modified on 6/20/2023, see 48. (mam)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #38 Motion to Strike #31 / #35 Counterclaim by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Strike #31 / #35 Complaint by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael)
June 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Amash, Michael)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick re #34 Motion to Partially Seal 28-5 Declaration of Timothy Simmons at 70-84 (Legal Memorandum). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Salva, Raymond)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Partially Seal #28 -5 Declaration of Timothy Simmons at 70-84 (Legal Memorandum) by Plaintiff/Counter Defendant International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #34 Plaintiff's MOTION to Partially Seal Document [28-5] Affidavit in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(byk)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against William B. Creeden, Kateryna Jones, Newton B. Jones, filed by John T. Fultz. (NOTE -- This is a duplicate of #31 , re-filed to account for third party complaint portion; parties added.) (mam)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond). Added Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 6/16/2023. (mam)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #33 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/15/2023, now linked to #33 . (mam)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 COUNTERCLAIM against International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO, filed by J. Tom Baca, Arnie Stadnick and Timothy Simmons (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/16/2023 to include additional files. (mam)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of J. Tom Baca re #27 Memorandum in Opposition to #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendant J. Tom Baca. (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/16/2023, now linked to #27 per counsel. (mam)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DECLARATION of Arnie Stadnick re #27 Memorandum in Opposition to #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/16/2023, now linked to #27 per counsel. (mam)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Timothy Simmons re #27 Memorandum in Opposition to #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Timothy Simmons. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/16/2023, now linked to #27 per counsel. (mam) Modified on 6/22/2023, Exhibit 4 sealed per 52. (mam)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Salva, Raymond)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER STRIKING re #24 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #19 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #22 Answer to Amended Complaint and Counterclaim, #20 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #23 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #25 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Violation of D. Kan. R. 5.1(a). Counsel is also instructed to review D. Kan. R. 7.1(d) for page limitations. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/14/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cm)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 (STRICKEN per 26) -- AFFIDAVIT of J. Tom Baca re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/14/2023, see 26. (mam)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (STRICKEN per 26) -- AFFIDAVIT of Arnie Stadnick re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/14/2023, see 26. (mam)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (STRICKEN per 26) -- AFFIDAVIT of Timothy Simmons re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/15/2023, see 26. (kmc)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (STRICKEN per 26) -- ANSWER to #4 First Amended Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO by Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick, J. Tom Baca. (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/14/2023, see 26. (mam)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (STRICKEN per 26) -- MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #20 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/14/2023, see 26. (mam)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (STRICKEN per 26) -- MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/14/2023, see 26. (mam)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (STRICKEN per 26) -- MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick re #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. (Salva, Raymond) Modified on 6/14/2023, see 26. (mam)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John B. Boyd on behalf of All Defendants. (Salva, Raymond) Modified counsels name to reflect document on 6/14/2023. (kmc)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 , #12 and #13 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Antonio Ruiz, William T. Hanley, and David A. Rosenfeld for J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, and Arnie Stadnick pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/13/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' are granted 5 additional pages for their response brief. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 6/13/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Salva, Raymond)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for attorney David A. Rosenfeld to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6082992.) by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Salva, Raymond)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for attorney William T. Hanley to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6082980.) by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Salva, Raymond)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Antonio Ruiz to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6082970.) by Defendants J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James.) (Salva, Raymond)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction in Excess of the Page Limit. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(byk)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Raymond E. Salva, Jr. on behalf of All Defendants. (Salva, Raymond)
June 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Letter Received from Class Member to Judge Melgren. (sz)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter received from Class Member. (kmc)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) TRO Hearing set for 6/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in KC Courtroom 476 before Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren. (cm)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT/INFORMATION SHEET to #6 Memorandum in Support of #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to J. Tom Baca, Timothy Simmons, Arnie Stadnick (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael Amash, #2 Affidavit of Lawrence McManamon)(Amash, Michael)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael) Added Motion for Preliminary Injunction on 6/5/2023. (kmc)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Amash, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Amash, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Amash, Michael)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nao)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6072591.), filed by International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Amash, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers & Helpers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Michael E. Amash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: William B. Creeden
Represented By: Michael J. McGuire
Represented By: Librado Arreola
Represented By: Thomas J. Bath, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Kateryna Jones
Represented By: Phillip Reed Martens
Represented By: Samuel Gladney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Newton B. Jones
Represented By: Phillip Reed Martens
Represented By: Samuel Gladney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: J. Tom Baca
Represented By: John B. Boyd
Represented By: Raymond E Salva, Jr
Represented By: Antonio Ruiz
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Represented By: William T. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Arnie Stadnick
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Represented By: John B. Boyd
Represented By: Raymond E Salva, Jr
Represented By: William T. Hanley
Represented By: Antonio Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: John T. Fultz
Represented By: Antonio Ruiz
Represented By: John B. Boyd
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Raymond E Salva, Jr
Represented By: William T. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Simmons
Represented By: Antonio Ruiz
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Represented By: John B. Boyd
Represented By: Raymond E Salva, Jr
Represented By: William T. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Boilermakers for Change
Represented By: Curtis G. Barnhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?