Theriault et al v. New Direction IRA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Gilbert Theriault and William Weigel
Defendant: New Direction IRA, Inc., Mainstar Trust, Entrust of Colorado, New Direction Trust Company and First Trust Company of Onaga
Case Number: 2:2023cv02477
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Alan Hall for New Direction IRA, Inc. and New Direction Trust Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 12/7/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Harrison Michael Rosenthal on behalf of New Direction IRA, Inc., New Direction Trust Company (Rosenthal, Harrison)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Kevin Alan Hall to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6221539.) by Defendants New Direction IRA, Inc., New Direction Trust Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(McAllister, Stephen)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant Mainstar Trust must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 6, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/22/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
November 21, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Mainstar Trust (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Bien, Richard)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brian C. Fries on behalf of Mainstar Trust. (Fries, Brian)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard N. Bien on behalf of Mainstar Trust. (Bien, Richard)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Todd Carroll for New Direction IRA, Inc. and New Direction Trust Company pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/20/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants New Direction IRA, Inc. and New Direction Trust Company must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 29, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/20/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Matthew Todd Carroll to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6206529.) by Defendants New Direction IRA, Inc., New Direction Trust Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(McAllister, Stephen)
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendants New Direction IRA, Inc., New Direction Trust Company (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (McAllister, Stephen)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stephen R. McAllister on behalf of New Direction IRA, Inc., New Direction Trust Company. (McAllister, Stephen)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Broomes for all further proceedings. District Judge Toby Crouse no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 10/30/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ta)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Joseph Gilbert Theriault, William Weigel. (Nehrbass, Scott)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6188982.), filed by Joseph Gilbert Theriault, William Weigel. (Nehrbass, Scott)
October 30, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mainstar Trust, New Direction IRA, Inc., New Direction Trust Company (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
October 30, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theriault et al v. New Direction IRA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Direction IRA, Inc.
Represented By: Harrison Michael Rosenthal
Represented By: Kevin Alan Hall
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Stephen R. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstar Trust
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Represented By: Richard N. Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entrust of Colorado
Represented By: Harrison Michael Rosenthal
Represented By: Kevin Alan Hall
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Stephen R. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Direction Trust Company
Represented By: Kevin Alan Hall
Represented By: Harrison Michael Rosenthal
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Stephen R. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Trust Company of Onaga
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Represented By: Richard N. Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gilbert Theriault
Represented By: Alexandra N.C. Rose
Represented By: Jeff P. DeGraffenreid
Represented By: Scott C. Nehrbass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Weigel
Represented By: Alexandra N.C. Rose
Represented By: Jeff P. DeGraffenreid
Represented By: Scott C. Nehrbass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?