Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC v. Lowe et al
Plaintiff: Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC
Defendant: Margaret M. Lowe, Daniel H. Lowe, David R. Smith, Matterhorn LLC, Commercial Reposition Partners 17, LLC, Yonke Law, LLC and Joseph Jackson
Case Number: 2:2023cv02486
Filed: November 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Margaret M. Lowe.(Wirken, Christopher)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commercial Reposition Partners 17, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Fancher, Logan)
November 30, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC upon Commercial Reposition Partners 17, LLC served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023 (Perry, Braden)
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader by Commercial Reposition Partners 17, LLC.(Zluticky, Nicholas)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Jackson.(Miles, Christopher)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC. Matterhorn LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2023, answer due 1/5/2024. (Houchin, Katy)
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC. Yonke Law, LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2023, answer due 1/5/2024. (Houchin, Katy)
November 8, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC. David R. Smith waiver sent on 11/6/2023, answer due 1/5/2024. (Houchin, Katy)
November 8, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher B. Wirken on behalf of Margaret M. Lowe waiver sent on 11/6/2023, answer due 1/5/2024. (Wirken, Christopher) Modified on 11/9/2023 to correct docket text from entry of appearance (nac).
November 7, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit Interpleader Funds pursuant to 28 USC 1335 by Plaintiff Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Perry, Braden)
November 3, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC identifying none as corporate parent . (Perry, Braden)
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC. (Perry, Braden)
November 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6194324.), filed by Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC.(Perry, Braden)
November 3, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commercial Reposition Partners 17, LLC, Yonke Law, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
November 3, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC v. Lowe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steckler Wayne & Love, PLLC
Represented By: Braden M. Perry
Represented By: Katy L. Houchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret M. Lowe
Represented By: Christopher B. Wirken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matterhorn LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Reposition Partners 17, LLC
Represented By: Logan Fancher
Represented By: Nicholas J. Zluticky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yonke Law, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Jackson
Represented By: Christopher C. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?