Rogers v. Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Rogers
Defendant: Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc., Ron Allar Trucking, LLC d/b/a Jeff Foster Heavey Haul, Brimac, Inc. d/b/a Jeff Foster Trucking Brokerage Division, Jeff Foster Fleet Service, Inc., Jeff Foster Collision Center, Inc., Jeff Foster Aggregate, Inc., Jeffrey Foster, Michael Ray Plunkett, Ron Allar Trucking, LLC doing business as Jeff Foster Heavey Haul and Brimac, Inc. doing business as Jeff Foster Trucking Brokerage Division
Case Number: 2:2023cv02533
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A)(1)(A) Disclosures by Brimac, Inc., Jeffrey Foster, Jeff Foster Aggregate, Inc., Jeff Foster Collision Center, Inc., Jeff Foster Fleet Service, Inc., Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc., Michael Ray Plunkett, Ron Allar Trucking, LLC. (Otto, Theresa)
January 23, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26(a) Disclosures by Nicole Rogers. (Hardee, Lee)
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 STATE COURT RECORDS from Wyandotte County. (Otto, Theresa)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brimac, Inc., Jeffrey Foster, Jeff Foster Aggregate, Inc., Jeff Foster Collision Center, Inc., Jeff Foster Fleet Service, Inc., Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc., Michael Ray Plunkett, Ron Allar Trucking, LLC identifying Foster Holding Group, Inc. as corporate parent. (Otto, Theresa)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 by Nicole Rogers identifying None as corporate parent. (Hardee, Lee)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/30/2024 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/13/23. (ala)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Ray Plunkett. (Otto, Theresa)
December 8, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Ron Allar Trucking, LLC. (Otto, Theresa)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Brimac, Inc. (Otto, Theresa)
December 8, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeff Foster Fleet Service, Inc. (Otto, Theresa)
December 8, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeff Foster Collision Center, Inc. (Otto, Theresa)
December 8, 2023 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeff Foster Aggregate, Inc. (Otto, Theresa)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc. (Otto, Theresa)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Jeffrey Foster. (Otto, Theresa)
December 4, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Jeff Foster Collision Center, Inc., Ron Allar Trucking, LLC, Jeff Foster Aggregate, Inc., Michael Ray Plunkett, Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc., Jeffrey Foster, Brimac, Inc., Jeff Foster Fleet Service, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Otto, Theresa)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Jeff Foster Collision Center, Inc., Ron Allar Trucking, LLC, Jeff Foster Aggregate, Inc., Michael Ray Plunkett, Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc., Jeffrey Foster, Brimac, Inc., Jeff Foster Fleet Service, Inc. (Otto, Theresa)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte, case number WY23CV300021, trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6217193.), filed by Jeff Foster Collision Center, Inc., Ron Allar Trucking, LLC, Jeff Foster Aggregate, Inc., Michael Ray Plunkett, Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc., Jeffrey Foster, Brimac, Inc., Jeff Foster Fleet Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition)(Otto, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Rogers
Represented By: Lee R. Hardee, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Foster Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Allar Trucking, LLC d/b/a Jeff Foster Heavey Haul
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brimac, Inc. d/b/a Jeff Foster Trucking Brokerage Division
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Foster Fleet Service, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Foster Collision Center, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Foster Aggregate, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Foster
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ray Plunkett
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Allar Trucking, LLC doing business as Jeff Foster Heavey Haul
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brimac, Inc. doing business as Jeff Foster Trucking Brokerage Division
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?