Bloomer v. HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Dean Bloomer and Estate of decedent, JAMES WRIGHT BLOOMER
Defendant: HMG PARK MANOR OF WESTWOOD LLC, Healthmark Group, LTD, HMG HEALTHCARE LLC and HMG Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv02059
Filed: February 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Julie A Robinson
Referring Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC identifying None as corporate parent (McDonald, Ted)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC.(McDonald, Ted)
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint (attorney) Paragraph 47 by Defendant HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (McDonald, Ted)
April 3, 2024 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC (McDonald, Ted)
March 19, 2024 Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 4/3/2024 for Defendant HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/19/2024. (nac)
March 19, 2024 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ted J. McDonald, III on behalf of HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC (McDonald, Ted)
February 20, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HMG Healthcare LLC, HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC, HMG Services, LLC, Healthmark Group, LTD. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
February 20, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)
February 17, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff James Dean Bloomer. (Steele, Jonathan)
February 17, 2024 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff James Dean Bloomer - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Steele, Jonathan)
February 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6277141.), filed by James Dean Bloomer. (Steele, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloomer v. HMG Park Manor of Westwood LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dean Bloomer
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of decedent, JAMES WRIGHT BLOOMER
Represented By: Jonathan T. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMG PARK MANOR OF WESTWOOD LLC
Represented By: Charles D. Miller
Represented By: Ted J. McDonald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthmark Group, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMG HEALTHCARE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMG Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?