EM Specialists, P.A. v. Emergency Management Midwest, LLC et al
Plaintiff: EM Specialists, P.A. (d/b/a Kansas Emergency Physicians) and EM Specialists, P.A. doing business as Kansas Emergency Physicians
Defendant: AmeriTeam Services, LLC, Emergency Management Midwest, LLC d/b/a TeamHealth Mid-America, Mediserv Medical Information Services, LTD and Emergency Management Midwest, LLC doing business as Teamhealth Mid-America
Case Number: 2:2024cv02105
Filed: March 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Julie A Robinson
Referring Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Filing 17 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Logan Patrick Moore on behalf of AmeriTeam Services, LLC, Emergency Management Midwest, LLC, Mediserv Medical Information Services, LTD. (Moore, Logan)
May 13, 2024 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J. Ennis on behalf of AmeriTeam Services, LLC, Emergency Management Midwest, LLC, Mediserv Medical Information Services, LTD (Ennis, Andrew)
May 13, 2024 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Britt Elin Wicklund on behalf of EM Specialists, P.A.. (Wicklund, Britt)
May 13, 2024 Filing 14 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EM Specialists, P.A. identifying None as corporate parent - Plaintiff's Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2) (Hudson, Tyler)
April 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for June 4, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 5705809) before Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 5/14/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/24/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 5/24/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on April 24, 2024. (drk)
April 23, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mediserv Medical Information Services, LTD identifying HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC as corporate parent . (Ennis, Andrew J.) Modified on 4/25/2024 to correct filer name (sz).
April 23, 2024 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Emergency Management Midwest, LLC identifying Team Finance, LLC as corporate parent . (Ennis, Andrew J.) Modified on 4/25/2024 to correct filer name (sz).
April 23, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Emergency Management Midwest, LLC identifying Team Finance, LLC as corporate parent . (Ennis, Andrew J.) Modified on 4/25/2024 to correct filer name (sz).
April 23, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Mediserv Medical Information Services, LTD. (Ennis, Andrew J.) Modified on 4/25/2024 to correct filer name (sz).
April 23, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by AmeriTeam Services, LLC. (Ennis, Andrew J.) Modified on 4/25/2024 to correct filer name (sz).
April 23, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Emergency Management Midwest, LLC.(Ennis, Andrew J.) Modified on 4/25/2024 to correct filer name (sz).
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by EM Specialists, P.A. upon Mediserv Medical Information Services, LTD served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024 (Hudson, Tyler)
April 4, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by EM Specialists, P.A. upon Emergency Management Midwest, LLC served on 3/27/2024, answer due 4/17/2024 (Hudson, Tyler)
April 4, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by EM Specialists, P.A. upon AmeriTeam Services, LLC served on 3/27/2024, answer due 4/17/2024 (Hudson, Tyler)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by EM Specialists, P.A. identifying None as corporate parent . (Hudson, Tyler)
March 22, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
March 22, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AmeriTeam Services, LLC, Emergency Management Midwest, LLC, Mediserv Medical Information Services, LTD (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
March 21, 2024 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff EM Specialists, P.A. (d/b/a Kansas Emergency Physicians) - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Hudson, Tyler)
March 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6304701.), filed by EM Specialists, P.A. (d/b/a Kansas Emergency Physicians). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudson, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EM Specialists, P.A. v. Emergency Management Midwest, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EM Specialists, P.A. (d/b/a Kansas Emergency Physicians)
Represented By: Tyler W. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EM Specialists, P.A. doing business as Kansas Emergency Physicians
Represented By: Britt Elin Wicklund
Represented By: Eric D. Barton
Represented By: Tyler W. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriTeam Services, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Ennis
Represented By: Blake H. Reeves
Represented By: Logan Patrick Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Management Midwest, LLC d/b/a TeamHealth Mid-America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediserv Medical Information Services, LTD
Represented By: Andrew J. Ennis
Represented By: Blake H. Reeves
Represented By: Logan Patrick Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Management Midwest, LLC doing business as Teamhealth Mid-America
Represented By: Andrew J. Ennis
Represented By: Blake H. Reeves
Represented By: Logan Patrick Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?