Green v. Mission Plumbing
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Defendant: Mission Plumbing
Case Number: 2:2024cv02117
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2024 Filing 14 JUDGMENT ENTERED: Pursuant to the Court's Order filed on May 22, 2024, (Doc. #13 ), this case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/24/2024. Mailed to pro se party Courtney Green by regular mail. (jal)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The Judgment of the Court, Doc. 11, and its previous Order dismissing the case, Doc. 10, are set aside. This case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/21/2024. Mailed to pro se party Courtney Green by regular mail. (kas)
May 22, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CORRESPONDENCE. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/21/2024. Mailed to pro se party Courtney Green by regular mail. (Attachments: #1 Emailed Correspondence)(kas)
May 17, 2024 Filing 11 (SET ASIDE PER #13 ORDER) JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/17/2024. Mailed to pro se party Courtney Green by regular mail. (kas) Modified on 5/22/2024 (kas).
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (SET ASIDE PER #13 ORDER) ORDER. This case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/17/2024. Mailed to pro se party Courtney Green by regular mail. (kas) Modified on 5/22/2024 (kas).
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 5/15/2024. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/2/2024. Mailed to pro se party Courtney Green by regular mail. (kas)
May 1, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Show Cause by Plaintiff Courtney Green. (kas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2024: #1 Ink signed version received 5/2/24) (kas).
May 1, 2024 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #8 MOTION for extension of time. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alh)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to show cause by 4/19/2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 4/2/2024. Sent to pro se party Courtney Green by regular mail. (mam)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U.S. Marshals Service shall withhold service on the defendant until further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/29/2024. Mailed to pro se party Courtney Green by regular mail. (ca)
March 29, 2024 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Courtney Green - trial to be held in Kansas City. (ca)
March 29, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re #3 Financial Affidavit by Plaintiff Courtney Green. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (ca)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Courtney Green. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachment: #1 Financial Affidavit)(ca) Modified to change title and term motion per chambers on 3/28/2024 (ca).
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Courtney Green. (ca)
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Courtney Green. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Envelope)(ca)
March 28, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Docket entry #3 Contains two affidavits: an Affidavit of Financial Status and an Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal in Forma Pauperis however the one page Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees was not submitted. The motion document was mailed to the plaintiff for her to complete and return to the court. (kao)
March 28, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing and Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is missing. The filing party is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. Mailed to Courtney Green by email and regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 28, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Mission Plumbing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Plumbing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?