Grimm v. Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Les Grimm
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. and Unum Group
Case Number: 2:2024cv02147
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2024 at 02:00 PM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/28/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/8/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 7/8/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/29/24. (msb)
May 28, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. identifying Tyson Foods, Inc. as corporate parent. (Monsees, Samantha)
May 28, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 First Amended Complaint by Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Monsees, Samantha)
May 14, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., filed by Les Grimm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit 2 - EEOC NRTS)(Kinney, Kenneth)
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 5/28/2024 for Defendant Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/8/2024. (jsh)
May 6, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Les Grimm upon Unum Group served on 4/30/2024, answer due 5/21/2024. (Kinney, Kenneth)
April 24, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Les Grimm upon Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Kinney, Kenneth)
April 19, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Unum Group (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
April 15, 2024 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Les Grimm - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Kinney, Kenneth)
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Les Grimm. (Kinney, Kenneth)
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City (Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number CKSDC-6323959.), filed by Les Grimm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit 2 - EEOC NRTS)(Kinney, Kenneth)
April 15, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimm v. Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Grimm
Represented By: Kenneth D. Kinney
Represented By: Thomas F. Ralston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Represented By: Harper Elizabeth Palmer
Represented By: Samantha Jane Monsees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?