Shaw v. Commerce Bank
Plaintiff: Robert M. Shaw
Defendant: Commerce Bank
Case Number: 2:2024cv02153
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2024 Filing 19 DOCKET ANNOTATION: 2 attachments were inadvertently not filed with #18 Order. They have been added to the entry and are attached to this annotation for noticing purposes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (ca)
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CORRESPONDENCE. The Court received the attached correspondence from pro se plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. The Court will take no further action concerning the attached correspondence in light of the Order which was filed on May 31, 2024, dismissing this case, Doc. #17 . Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 6/3/2024. Mailed to pro se party Robert M. Shaw 216 W. Empire Street Galena, KS 66739 by regular mail. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2024: #1 #2 (ca).
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Dismiss. This case is dismissed and the parties will bear their own fees, costs, and expenses incurred during the course of this litigation. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 05/30/2024. Mailed to pro se party Robert M. Shaw by regular mail. (kmc) Modified on 6/3/2024 to correct docket text (kas).
May 30, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. (kmc)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #13 Motion to Supplement (titled "Motion to Add Evidence"). To the extent plaintiff seeks to supplement his motion for summary judgment, the motion is denied as moot because the district judge denied plaintiff's summary judgment motion without prejudice. (ECF 12.) To the extent plaintiff seeks to supplement his complaint, the motion is denied as moot because the court has ordered plaintiff to file an amended complaint. (ECF 14.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/28/2024.Mailed to pro se party plaintiff by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 Commerce Bank's Motion for More Definite Statement. The court grants the motion as unopposed because the time to respond under D. Kan. Rule 7.1(d)(4) has expired, and plaintiff did not file a timely response. By June 14, 2024, plaintiff must file an amended complaint with more definite statements in support of each of his claims, which, as far as the court can discern, include breach of contract, violation of the Fair Debt Collection Practices Act, and violation of the Fourteenth Amendment. The court reminds plaintiff that Fed. R. Civ. P. 10 requires a plaintiff to state the claims in his complaint "in numbered paragraphs, each limited as far as practicable to a single set of circumstances." The court cautions plaintiff that, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e), failure to file such an amended complaint by the deadline will likely result in the court recommending that the district judge presiding over this action strike the complaint and dismiss the action.Mailed to pro se party plaintiff by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
May 25, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Supplement (titled: Motion to add evidence) by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Ex 22, #2 Ex 22-1)(kmc)
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. It is ordered by the Court that Shaw's #5 Motion for Summary Judgment, is DENIED without prejudice. As a result, his #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 Motions to Supplement are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 05/24/2024. Mailed to pro se party Robert M. Shaw by regular mail. (kmc)
May 16, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE (titled: Concerning Commerce Banks claim that there is Binding Arbitration agreements) by Robert M. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Ex 18) (kmc)
May 16, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Supplement (titled: Motion to add more Exhibits) by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Ex 17)(kmc)
May 16, 2024 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #10 MOTION to Supplement. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alh)
May 15, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Supplement (titled: Motion to add more evidence) by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Ex 16, #2 Ex 16-1, #3 Ex 16-2, #4 Ex 16-3, #5 Ex 16-4)(kmc)
May 15, 2024 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #9 MOTION to Supplement. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alh)
May 14, 2024 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #6 MOTION to Supplement, #7 MOTION to Supplement, and #8 MOTION to Supplement. The motions will be resolved by the District Judge.(alh)
May 14, 2024 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document Motions No Longer Referred mailed to pro se plaintiff on 5/14/2024 by regular mail. (alh)
May 12, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Supplement (titled: Motion to add more evidence) by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Ex 15, #2 Ex 15-1, #3 Ex 15-2, #4 Ex 15-3)(kmc)
May 12, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Supplement (titled: Motion to add more Exhibits) by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Ex 14, #2 Ex 14-1, #3 Ex 14-2)(kmc)
May 12, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Supplement (titled: Motion to add more Exhibits) by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Ex 13, #2 Ex 13-1, #3 Ex 13-2)(kmc)
May 11, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Ex 12, #2 Ex 12-1, #3 Ex 12-2)(kmc)
May 10, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Commerce Bank (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Bogle, Kemper)
April 19, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw - trial to be held in Kansas City. (jsh)
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Robert M. Shaw. (jsh)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Robert M. Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Proof of Service) (jsh)
April 18, 2024 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 200001419. (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Commerce Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce Bank
Represented By: Kemper Anne Bogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?