Applebee's Franchisor LLC v. Georgas et al
Plaintiff: Applebee's Franchisor LLC
Defendant: John W. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020, William J. Georgas, WJG Revocable Trust Dated July 7, 2020 and Sophia K. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020
Case Number: 2:2024cv02497
Filed: October 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Brooks G Severson
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2024 Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference re-set for 2/3/2025 at 11:00 AM by telephone (BGS CONFERENCE LINE: 1-316-402-0044 CONFERENCE ID: 485 069 538) before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson.(df)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2025 at 10:00 AM by Telephone BGS - -CONFERENCE LINE: 1-316-402-0044 CONFERENCE ID: 485 069 538 before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 1/14/2025. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/23/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 1/23/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 12/17/2024. (ca)
December 16, 2024 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WJG Revocable Trust Dated July 7, 2020, Sophia K. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020, John W. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020, William J. Georgas identifying None as corporate parent . (Beil, William)
December 16, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by WJG Revocable Trust Dated July 7, 2020, Sophia K. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020, John W. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020, William J. Georgas.(Beil, William)
December 4, 2024 Filing 12 (DUPLICATE FILING - SEE #5 ) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Applebee's Franchisor LLC upon William J. Georgas (Baggott, Brian) Modified on 12/5/2024 (kas).
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answers or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint. Deadline for Defendants to answer or respond extended to 12/16/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 11/19/24. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
November 18, 2024 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jason M. Hans on behalf of All Defendants (Hans, Jason)
November 18, 2024 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by William D. Beil on behalf of All Defendants (Beil, William)
November 18, 2024 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #1 Complaint (attorney), by Defendants WJG Revocable Trust Dated July 7, 2020, Sophia K. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020, John W. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020, William J. Georgas (referred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson) (Beil, William) Modified motion event on 11/19/2024 (msb).
November 11, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Applebee's Franchisor LLC upon WJG Revocable Trust Dated July 7, 2020 served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024 (Baggott, Brian)
November 11, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Applebee's Franchisor LLC upon Sophia K. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020 served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024 (Baggott, Brian)
November 11, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Applebee's Franchisor LLC upon William J. Georgas served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024 (Baggott, Brian)
November 11, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Applebee's Franchisor LLC upon John W. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020 served on 11/4/2024, answer due 11/25/2024 (Baggott, Brian)
October 31, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to William J. Georgas, John W. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020, Sophia K. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020, WJG Revocable Trust Dated July 7, 2020 (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
October 31, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
October 30, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Applebee's Franchisor, LLC identifying Dine Brands Global, Inc. as corporate parent . (Baggott, Brian)
October 30, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Applebee's Franchisor, LLC. (Baggott, Brian)
October 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number CKSDC-6504742.), filed by Applebee's Franchisor, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Baggott, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Applebee's Franchisor LLC v. Georgas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applebee's Franchisor LLC
Represented By: Michael Philip Pappas
Represented By: Brian Baggott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: Jason M. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Georgas
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: Jason M. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WJG Revocable Trust Dated July 7, 2020
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: Jason M. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia K. Georgas 2020 Irrevocable Trust Dated December 22, 2020
Represented By: William D. Beil
Represented By: Jason M. Hans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?