Matson v. Kansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: Mike C. Matson
Defendant: Kansas, State of, Kansas Department of Corrections, Ray Roberts, Jay Shelton and Joel Hrabe
Case Number: 5:2011cv03192
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Norton
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER dismissing 252 Motion for Protective Order; dismissing 253 Amended Motion for Protective Order. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 6/30/2017. Mailed to pro se party plaintiff Mike D. Matson by regular mail.(wh)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 226 to alter or amend judgment is denied. Plaintiff's amended motions to file additional pages 236 and to file a supplemental exhibit 238 are granted. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 05/01/14. (Mailed to pro se party Mike D. Matson by regular mail.) (smnd)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 182 for leave to file a second amended complaint is denied. Defendant's motion 144 for summary judgment is granted. Plaintiff's federal claims are dismissed with prejudice and pla intiff's state law claim is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion 203 to file supplemental exhibits is granted. Plaintiff's motion 213 for in camera review is denied. Plaintiff's objections 198 & 216 to orders of the Magistrate Judge are denied. Plaintiff's request 164 for relief under Rule 56(f) is denied. By virtue of these rulings, the remaining pending motions 207 , 218 & 223 are moot. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 1/23/2014. (Mailed to pro se party Mike C. Matson by regular mail.) (smnd)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 87 Motion for Order; denying 88 Motion for Sanctions. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 10/11/2013. Mailed to pro se party Plaintiff by regular mail. (mrb)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 74 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order; denying 81 Plaintiff's Motion for Oral Argument. See attached order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 8/20/2013. Mailed to pro se party Plaintiff by regular mail. (mrb)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 57 to alter or amend judgment is denied. The court also denies defendant's motion 63 to stay as moot. Defendant has filed a motion 54 for extension of time to respond to plaintiff� 39;s discovery requests until a scheduling order is completed and deadlines for discovery are determined in this case. This motion shall be granted and the court refers this case to U.S. Magistrate Judge Sebelius for supervision of the discovery and pretrial process. The court also refers plaintiff's motion 62 for appointment of counsel to Magistrate Judge Sebelius for decision. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 03/21/13. (Mailed to pro se party Mike C. Matson by regular mail.) (smnd)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendant's motion 21 to dismiss or for summary judgment shall be granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's claim that defendant illegally retaliated against plaintiff by transferring him to a differe nt cell shall not be dismissed as of this time. Defendant is not foreclosed from filing a later motion for similar relief. Plaintiff's other claims regarding cell searches and his access to the courts shall be dismissed. Plaintiff's requ est 26 for entry of default, plaintiff's motion 35 to strike, and plaintiff's motion 44 for contempt shall be denied. The court further finds, for purposes of clearing the docket of outstanding motions, that plaintiff's "mo tion" 28 in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss should not be considered as a motion, but as a response to a motion. Plaintiff's motion 40 for extension of time to file a supplemental response shall be considered moot because the supplemental response was filed and has been considered by the court. Signed by Senior District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 1/9/2013. (Mailed to pro se party Mike C. Matson by regular mail.) (smnd)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 31 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed until the Court rules on Defendant's motion to dismiss or for summary judgment. If the Court denies Defendant's motion, the stay will be lift ed and this case will be set for a scheduling conference. Granting in part and denying in part 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff may supplement his response to the motion to dismiss or for summary judgment by November 26, 2012. The motion is otherwise denied. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/31/2012.Mailed to pro se party Mike C. Matson, #59259, Ellsworth Correctional Facility, PO Box 107, Ellsworth, KS 67439 by regular mail (pp)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion 2 for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees, his request in his amended complaint for injunctive relief against future retaliatory acts, and his request for damages against defendant in h is official capacity are denied. This action is dismissed and all relief is denied, without prejudice, as against all defendants with the exception of defendant Joel Hrabe. All claims, with the exception of the claims in Counts I and II of plaintif f's amended complaint 6 , are dismissed from this action, without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall prepare waiver of service forms pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The clerk of the court shall enter the Ka nsas Department of Corrections as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez report ordered herein. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 3/29/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Mike C. Matson by regular mail.) (smnd)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is required to satisfy the filing fee herein by either submitting the remainder of the filing fee, which is $50.00; or the certified statement of his inmate account for the appropriate six-month period to support his pending motion to proceed WPF. Plaintiff is given thirty (30) days in which to file a complete Amended Complaint upon forms provided by the court that either cures the deficiencies or omits the improperly joined or otherwise deficient claims. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 1/5/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Mike C. Matson by regular mail.) (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matson v. Kansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike C. Matson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Hrabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?