Jones (ID 69723) v. Heimgartner et al

Petitioner: Charles L. Jones
Respondent: James Heimgartner and Derek Schmidt
Case Number: 5:2012cv03055
Filed: February 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena for Trial Exhibits. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 6/21/18. (kao)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 84 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall file his merits brief on Claims 2, 6, and 7 no later than March 7, 2018, Respondents shall answer no later than March 21, 2018; and Petitioner may reply no later than April 11, 2018. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 2/12/18. (kao)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that Claims 1, 3, 4, and 5 are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer and submit a joint briefing schedule for the remaining habeas claims within 14 days of the date of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 6/7/17. (kao)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: A certificate of appealability is denied. Petitioner's motion 20 for stay and abeyance is denied. Respondents' motion 18 to dismiss this action as time-barred is sustained. This habeas corpus petition is dismissed with prejudice as not timely filed. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/19/14. Mailed to pro se party Charles L. Jones by regular mail. (smnd)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ENTERED: Respondents are required to submit within thirty (30) days of this order a preliminary response to the petition 1 and petitioner's response 8 filed herein. Such response shall be limited to the question of whether or not thi s petition should be dismissed as time-barred. Petitioner is granted twenty (20) days after receipt by him of a copy of the respondents' preliminary response to file a reply thereto. Petitioner's request 8 for hearing, motion 8 to ame nd petition and to add claims and factual allegations, motion 11 to move case forward, and motion 12 for release on bond are denied without prejudice. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 9/25/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Charles L. Jones by regular mail.) (smnd)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner is granted thirty (30) days to show cause why this petition for writ of habeas corpus should not be dismissed as time barred. Petitioner's motion 2 for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted; h is motion 3 for evidentiary hearing, motion 4 to appoint counsel, motion 5 for amendment of 2254 petition, and motion 6 for leave to conduct discovery are denied without prejudice. Signed by Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 4/20/2012. (Mailed to pro se party Charles L. Jones by regular mail.) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones (ID 69723) v. Heimgartner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Heimgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Derek Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?