Requena (ID 48877) v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Adrian M. Requena
Defendant: Ray Roberts, Sam Cline, Berry Larson, James Reeves, Thomas L. Williams, M. Lamb, Joshua Pettay, C. McGehee, G. Riemann, C. Schneider and (fnu) Chick
Case Number: 5:2013cv03043
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendant Cranston's motion for summary judgment (ECF## 75 and 76 ), and the defendants Wendy Newkirk's and LeVon Crotts's motion for summary judgment (ECF## 85 and 86 ) are granted. Plaintiff Requena's motion for summary judgment ECF# 93 is denied. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/19/20. Mailed to pro se party Adrian M. Requena by regular mail. (smnd)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendants' motion to stay discovery (Doc. 88 ) is granted, and plaintiff's opposition (Doc. 89 ) is denied. Plaintiff is granted to and including January 3, 2020, to respond to the motion of defendants Crotts and Newkirk to dismiss or for summary judgment. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/10/19. Mailed to pro se party Adrian M. Requena by regular mail. (smnd)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel 44 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to discover witnesses, subpoena witnesses for deposition and/or for interrogatories 45 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's moti on for leave to reissue previous issuance of summons 47 is liberally construed as a motion for service and is granted. Plaintiff's motion for issuance of subpoena 48 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 49 is denied. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file correct caption 52 is granted. The clerk of the court shall modify the caption to identify the defendants as Wendy Newkirk, Michael Cranston, and Levon Crotts. Plaintiff' motion for leave to file supplemental complaint 52 is denied. Plaintiff's motions for leave to submit evidence 53 , 54 & 57 and motion for leave to continue submission of evidence 56 are denied. The clerk of the court shall serve defendants New kirk, Cranston, and Crotts under the e-service pilot program in effect with the Kansas Department of Corrections (KDOC). The Clerk of the Court shall enter KDOC as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez r eport. Upon the filing of that report, KDOC may move for termination from this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/25/19. Mailed to pro se party Adrian M. Requena and Attorney General for the State of Kansas by regular mail. (smnd)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for temporary injunction 40 is denied. The Court sets aside that portion of its order entered on September 22, 2017, that directs the submission of the initial partial filing fee on or before October 23, 2017. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/13/17. Mailed to pro se party Adrian Michael Requena by regular mail. (smnd)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion 38 is granted and the time is extended to and including October 23, 2017. No further extension will be allowed. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 09/22/17. Mailed to pro se party Adrian Michael Requena by regular mail. (smnd)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for extension of thirty days 35 is granted. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 07/18/17. Mailed to pro se party Adrian M. Requena by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Requena (ID 48877) v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian M. Requena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berry Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Pettay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. McGehee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Riemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Chick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?