Counce v. Wolting et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Counce
Defendant: Ryan Wolting, Kansas State Highway Patrol, Tracy L. Ploutz, (fnu) Arnold, David Chamberlin, Joe Shepack, John Doe (1), John Doe (2), John Doe (3), John Doe (4), John/Jane Does, Ellsworth, Kansas, County of and Darian P. Dernovish
Case Number: 5:2013cv03199
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Ellsworth
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The court adopts and incorporates its Order of December 20, 2019 and, to the extent such communications might be deemed a request for relief, denies such request. (Dkt. 235 - 237 ). Future communications of a similar nature will be summarily denied by reference to this Order. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 10/8/2020. Mailed to pro se party Kenneth Counce at the Kaufman County Jail by regular mail. (mam)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 229 - Because the court lacks jurisdiction to grant any of the relief requested by Counce, the requests made in his December 19, 2019 letter are DENIED. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 12/20/2019. Mailed to pro se party Kenneth Counce at Kaufman County Jail P.O. Box 849, Kaufman, TX 75142 by regular mail. (jk)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 158 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 188 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 03/02/2018.Mailed to pro se party Kenneth Counce by regular mail. (aa)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend 124 is denied. All Doe defendants are dismissed from this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 03/13/17. Mailed to pro se party Kenneth Counce by regular mail. (smnd)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 99 is granted in part and denied in part. Counts XII, XIII, XV and XVII are dismissed. Defendants Eric Sauer, Mark Bruce, Kirk Simone, and Darian Dernovish are dismissed from this case. All that remains, then, are plaintiff's individual-capacity claims for excessive force and denial of medical care. Plaintiff's motion for defendants to furnish Trooper Arnold's first and middle name 116 is granted and plain tiff's motion to file supplemental citation 120 is denied as moot. Counsel for KHP defendant shall file a report furnishing Trooper Arnold's first and middle name and his residential address, as well as Trooper Wolting's residential address to the court in camera. Alternatively, KHP Defendants may file waivers of service of summons pursuant to Rule 4(d).The clerk's office shall refer this matter to a magistrate to handle discovery and pretrial matters. Plaintiff shall not file any discovery requests until after the parties have a discovery conference with the magistrate judge. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 02/17/17. Mailed to pro se party Kenneth Counce by regular mail. (smnd)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions 117 & 121 are denied. Defendants shall file a Martinez Report by March 17, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 02/16/17. Mailed to pro se party Kenneth Counce by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Counce v. Wolting et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Counce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Wolting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas State Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy L. Ploutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Chamberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Shepack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (4)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellsworth, Kansas, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darian P. Dernovish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?