Catron v. Colt Energy Inc et al

Plaintiff: Richard Catron
Defendant: Colt Energy Inc, Layne Energy, Inc., Layne Energy Resources, Inc., Layne Energy Operating, LLC and PostRock MidContinent Production, LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv04073
Filed: July 3, 2013
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Wilson
Referring Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Carlos Murguia
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Defendants' 74 Motion to Dismiss. Further, the case is remanded to the District Court of Wilson County, Kansas. The Court makes no ruling on the other pending 84 , 87 Motions. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 06/29/2015. (mg)
December 17, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 50 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. The parties should contact the magistrate judge to set a scheduling conference. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 12/17/2014. (mg)
June 23, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 52 Motion to Stay Discovery; finding as moot 52 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/23/14. (df)
November 13, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery and Expedited Responses; denying Plaintiff's 19 Motion to Stay Proceedings Except for Those Related to Remand and Jurisdictional Discovery; and denying with out prejudice Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Remand. Further, plaintiff's must file a response to Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss within twenty-one days of the date of this order. Defendants may reply within fourteen days of plaintiff's response. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 11/13/2013. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Catron v. Colt Energy Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Catron
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp(Designation Retained)
Represented By: W. Greg Wright(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Energy Inc
Represented By: Brandon J.B. Boulware(Designation Retained)
Represented By: James G. Flaherty(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeremy M. Suhr(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layne Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Dawn Arnone(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David E. Bengtson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brian K. O'Bleness
Represented By: Matthew J. Salzman(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layne Energy Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Dawn Arnone(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David E. Bengtson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brian K. O'Bleness
Represented By: Matthew J. Salzman(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layne Energy Operating, LLC
Represented By: Christina Dawn Arnone(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David E. Bengtson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brian K. O'Bleness
Represented By: Matthew J. Salzman(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PostRock MidContinent Production, LLC
Represented By: Elliot P. Anderson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffery A. Jordan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mack J. Morgan, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?