Tunnell v. Gill et al
Plaintiff: Kelly S. Tunnell
Defendant: Jason B. Gill, Jon Gill, Robert L. Hephner, Justin R. Manning and Daniel R. Mlagan
Case Number: 5:2014cv03206
Filed: October 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 39 is granted in part and denied in part as described fully in this Order. Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Decision on Summary Judgment 59 is denied. Plaintiff's Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge 60 is overruled and the court affirms Judge Sebelius's Order 55 . Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/30/18. Mailed to pro se party Kelly S. Tunnell by regular mail. (smnd)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 51 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 3/16/2018.Mailed to pro se party plaintiff Kelly S. Tunnell by regular mail. (wh)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall show good cause, in writing, to Judge Crabtree as to why his case should not be dismissed. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 15 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 07/28/17. Mailed to pro se party Kelly S. Tunnell by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tunnell v. Gill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly S. Tunnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason B. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Hephner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin R. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel R. Mlagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?