Smith (ID 87984) v. Trapp et al

Plaintiff: Shawn D. Smith
Defendant: Christopher Trapp, Danny W. Duft, James R. Collins, Ryan M. Shanks, Tamera J. Eggleston, Rex H. Pryor and Raymond Roberts
Case Number: 5:2014cv03220
Filed: December 1, 2014
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: Leavenworth
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Referring Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2018 117 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 75 Defendant Christopher Trapp's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 75 Defendant Christopher Trapp's Motion to Dismiss; granting 115 Defendant Tamera Eggleston's Motion to Set Aside. See Order for additional details. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 01/29/2018. Mailed to pro se party Shawn D. Smith by regular mail. (tvn)
October 27, 2017 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must show cause in writing why this matter should not be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 10/27/17. Mailed to pro se party Shawn D. Smith by regular mail. (kao)
October 4, 2017 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 93 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 10/04/2017.Mailed to pro se party Shawn D. Smith by regular mail. (cv)
September 11, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint 82 and Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint 66 are denied. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this Order within which to provide either (a) the Court or the Marshals Service with another location or address for Defendants Danny Duft and Tamera Eggleston for the purpose of serving Plaintiff's Complaint; or (b) good cause, in writ ing, to Judge Robinson as to why Mr. Duft and Ms. Eggleston should not be dismissed from this case. Failure to so may result in the dismissal of these defendants from this case. The Marshals Service shall personally serve Defendants Danny Duft and Tamera Eggleston with Plaintiff's Complaint at their last known addresses. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response 87 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 09/11/17. Mailed to pro se party Shawn D. Smith by regular mail. (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith (ID 87984) v. Trapp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Trapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny W. Duft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan M. Shanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamera J. Eggleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex H. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?