Gardiner (ID 46842) v. McBride et al
Plaintiff: Matthew T. Gardiner
Defendant: Bill McBride, Gene Ward, John Doe (1), John Doe (2), John Doe (3), John Doe (4), John Doe (5) and John Doe (6)
Case Number: 5:2015cv03151
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Seward
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 155 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Appointed Stacey R. Gilman and Anthony J. Durone for Matthew T. Gardiner. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/13/2020. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (amh)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 124 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Rebuttal to Reply (Doc. 153 ) is denied. See Memorandum and Order for additional details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 1/3/2020. Mailed to pro se party Matthew T. Gardiner by regular mail. (jal)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Submit Memorandum Over 30 Pages 132 is granted. Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion and Opposing Plaintiff' ;s Motion to Exceed Page Restrictions 134 is denied. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment 142 is granted. Defendants must submit their Reply in Support of their Motion for Sum mary Judgment on or before August 16, 2019. The court vacates the current trial setting and resets the matter of trial on March 3, 2020. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/07/19. Mailed to pro se party Matthew T. Gardiner by regular mail. (smnd)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's "Objection to Magistrate's Recommendation" 108 is overruled and Judge O'Hara's Report and Recommendation 106 is adopted. The court denies the portion of plaintiff's mo tion that seeks leave to amend his Complaint to include new allegations but grants the portion of plaintiff's motion that seeks leave to amend his Complaint to modify his current claims. Plaintiff must file his Second Amended Complaint, consis tent with this Order, within 10 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Supplemented Complaint 97 is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 12/21/18. Mailed to pro se party Matthew T. Gardiner by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardiner (ID 46842) v. McBride et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew T. Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (4)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (5)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (6)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?