Jackson (ID 77685) v. King et al
Plaintiff: Anthony T. Jackson
Defendant: Amanda King, Kevin Edwards and James Heimgartner
Case Number: 5:2015cv03183
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 35 is granted. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 06/08/18. Mailed to pro se party Anthony T. Jackson by regular mail. (smnd)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: The court directs plaintiff to show cause, in writing, on or before May 7, 2018, why it should not consider and rule on defendants' motion as an uncontested one under D. Kan. Rule 7.4(b). If plaintiff intends to file a response to defendants' motion, he must file it on or before May 7, 2018. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 04/05/18. Mailed to pro se party Anthony T. Jackson by regular mail. (smnd)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 38 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 1/31/2018.Mailed to pro se party (srj)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff is required to show good cause in writing, on or before September 8, 2017, why the court should not dismiss this action under Rule 41 for failing to comply with court orders. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/16/17. Mailed to pro se party Anthony T. Jackson by regular mail. (smnd)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 20 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 07/12/17. Mailed to pro se party Anthony T. Jackson by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson (ID 77685) v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony T. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Heimgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?