Toney (ID 71755) v. Harrod et al
Plaintiff: Michael M. Toney
Defendant: Gordon Harrod, (fnu) Nickelson, James Heimgartner, Jess Quidichay, Jr. and (fnu) Sullivan
Case Number: 5:2015cv03209
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 161 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Defendant Zacory Sullivan shall serve his discovery responses, without objections, to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, including produc ing all responsive documents, on or before September 21, 2020. No later than September 21, 2020, Defendant Zacory Sullivan shall show cause in writing to the Honorable Eric F. Melgren, why he should not be held in contempt of court and/or fined up to $100 per day from March 19, 2020, until the day his discovery responses are actually served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/3/2020. (ts)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 113 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/13/2019. (cm)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/11/2019. (cm)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 131 Defendants James Heimgartner, Jess Quidichay, Jr., and Zocory Sullivan's Motion to Stay Discovery. The remaining Scheduling Order deadlines are held in abeyance until the undersigned Magistrate Judge convenes a telephone conference with counsel following the District Judge's rulings on the pending motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 85, 113). Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 11/7/2018. (ts)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. The motion is denied with respect to Plaintiff's request to add Corizon to this action. The motion is granted with respect to Plaintiff's req uest to add a state law cause of action for medical malpractice against Defendants Harrod and Nickelson. Plaintiff shall electronically file his proposed Third Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is granted an extension of time, up to and including 60 days from the date he files his Third Amended Complaint, to accomplish service of summons and the Third Amended Complaint on Defendants Harrod and Sullivan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/1/2018. (ts)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 49 is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, Quidichay's motion to dismiss Toney's First Amendment claim is den ied. The following defendants are dismissed in their entirety: Kelley, Johnson and Austin. The following claims are dismissed from this suit: all claims for monetary damages against Heimgartner and all claims for monetary damages against Quidichay arising under RLUIPA, the Fourteenth Amendment, and the Eighth Amendment. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 10/20/17. Mailed to pro se party Michael M. Toney by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toney (ID 71755) v. Harrod et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael M. Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Harrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Nickelson
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Donoho
Represented By: Roger W. Slead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Heimgartner
Represented By: Thomas E. Nanney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Quidichay, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas E. Nanney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?