Dartez (ID 87393) v. Peters et al
Plaintiff: |
Samuel Lee Dartez, II |
Defendant: |
Rick Peters, FNU Ware, John Does, Mark French, Brian Johnson and Robert W. Dierks |
Case Number: |
5:2015cv03255 |
Filed: |
November 12, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Kansas |
Office: |
Topeka Office |
County: |
Riley |
Presiding Judge: |
Eric F. Melgren |
Presiding Judge: |
David J. Waxse |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 19, 2022 |
Filing
620
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 591 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court orders the KHP Defendants to pay Plaintiff $576,242.28 in fees and $2,052.67 in costs. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/19/2022. (jal)
|
March 25, 2022 |
Filing
605
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 589 Motion to Deposit Funds. See order for details. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/25/22. (msb)
|
February 8, 2022 |
Filing
586
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 580 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/8/2022. (kas)
|
February 26, 2021 |
Filing
544
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 427 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 431 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 433 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 435 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 437 Motion for Summary Judgment; d enying 439 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 441 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 443 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 445 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 447 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 450 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 532 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/26/2021. (cm)
|
July 24, 2019 |
Filing
297
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Follows oral order of 5/30/19 275 . Granting 191 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Samuel Lee Dartez, II; granting 255 MOTION to Enforce Subpoena filed by Samuel Lee Dartez, II. See order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/24/19. (adc)
|
March 2, 2018 |
Filing
149
WO MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 89 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying without prejudice to refiling 93 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice to refiling 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 119 Motion to Amend Complaint.; granting 129 Motion for Order; finding as moot 129 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 3/2/2018. (cm)
|
July 19, 2017 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days of this Order, Defendants Peters and Ware shall submit to the Court and to plaintiff full names and service addresses of John Does. 1-7. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Gregory P. Goheen and Robert L. Turner show cause, within 14 days of this Order, why extensions of time were not filed for an improper purpose (see Order for details). It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel will be appointed for Plaintiff (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 7/19/2017.Mailed to pro se party Samuel Lee Dartez, II by regular mail (cm)
|
June 27, 2017 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Respond to Defendant(s) Motion in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 78 is granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint 72 is denied. The Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Dan Good, John H. Riffel and Charles Rodman 36 is granted. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 06/26/17. Mailed to pro se party Samuel Lee Dartez, II by regular mail. (smnd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?