October 2, 2020 |
Filing
190
ORDER granting 176 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. The case is closed. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 10/2/2020. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (jal)
|
July 24, 2019 |
Filing
163
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 144 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 147 defendants' Motion to Strike or for leave to respond and 153 defendants' Motion to Strike or leave to respond; denying as moot 156 plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File. See Order for deadlines. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 07/23/2019. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (tvn)
|
January 7, 2019 |
Filing
151
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 148 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/7/19. Mailed to pro se party Deron McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (df)
|
October 16, 2018 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 122 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 10/15/18. (hw)
|
September 27, 2018 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC re 117 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that defendant Allen's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Motion to Stay Deadlines, and Motion to Stay Discovery 103 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion for judgment on the pleadings is denied. The motion is granted in all other respects. Defendant Allen must respond to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment by August 31, 2018. No further extensions will be granted on this response. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Berry's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 99 is denied. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 09/27/2018. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (tvn)
|
September 19, 2018 |
Filing
121
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 72 plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 09/19/2018. Mailed to pro se party Deron McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (tvn)
|
August 17, 2018 |
Filing
117
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 103 defendant Allen's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Motion to Stay Deadlines and Motion to Stay Discovery; denying 99 defendant Berry's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 08/17/2018. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (tvn)
|
May 30, 2018 |
Filing
106
NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiff shall show good cause in writing by June 15, 2018, why defendants Berry and Allen's motions for judgment on the pleadings should not be granted as unopposed, including any response plaintiff wishes the court to consider in this matter. Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2018. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/30/18. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (kao)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Defendants Aramark Correctional Services, Paul Church, Julie Dockendorff, and Rabbi M. Fellig's Motion to Dismiss 57 is granted as to Rabbi M. Fellig. It is granted on any individual capacity RLUIPA claims. It is denied in all other respects. Defendant Patricia Berry's Motion to Dismiss 59 is granted regarding defendant's § 1983 claim against her in her official capacity and for any retroactive relief. It is denied regarding any individua l capacity claim against her for money damages or prospective relief under § 1983. It is granted regarding plaintiff's RLUIPA claims. Defendant Cheryl Allen's Motion to Dismiss 70 is denied regarding any individual capacity RLUIPA c laim and denied in all other respects. Defendant Allen's Motion for Extension of Time 76 is granted. Defendant Allen shall respond to plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment within three weeks of this order's entry. Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Class Certification is denied and Motion to Appoint Counsel 80 is denied without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 03/16/18. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
|
January 30, 2018 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 78 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 1/29/18. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (kao)
|
June 14, 2017 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 48 is granted in part and denied in part. It is granted in all respects except that the Kansas Department of Corrections is immune from suit and cannot be added as a defendant. Plaint iff's claim for injunctive relief is construed as one against Defendant Berry in her official capacity. The Clerk's Office is directed to redact paragraph 11 from page 4 of Doc. 48-3 and file it as Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 06/14/17.Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
|