Williams v. Aulepp et al
Plaintiff: Anthony D. Williams
Defendant: K. Aulepp, (fnu) Blevins, (fnu) Phelps, (fnu) Johnson, (fnu) Manily, (fnu) Stanley, (fnu) Witt, (fnu) Herbig, (fnu) Cruz, C. Maye and (fnu) Lionhart
Case Number: 5:2016cv03044
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 71 Defendants Kristine Aulepp, Justin Blevins, Glenna Crews, Shannon Phelps, John Johnson, Jarad Herbig, Carol Witt, Michael Manley, Scott Stanley, Claude Maye, and Paul Leonhard's Joint Motion to Dismiss; denying 127 Plaintiff Anthony D. Williams's Motion for Extension of Time to a File Response as to 71 ; denying 128 Plaintiff Anthony D. Williams's Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 130 Plaintiff Anthony D. Williams's Motion for Conti nuance Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f)(d); granting in part 131 Plaintiff Anthony D. Williams's Motion to Enlarge Page Limit; granting in part 133 Plaintiff Anthony D. Williams's Motion for Leave to Supplement and/or Grant Placeholder Moti on Filed to Satisfy His Opposition Deadline to Defendants Summary Judgment Motion. The clerk is directed to enter a judgment of dismissal in favor of all named Defendants, as to all of Plaintiff's claims. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 11/6/2018. Mailed to pro se party Anthony D. Williams at Devens FMC by regular mail. (mam)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The court concludes the best course is to treat Defendants' motion as one for summary Judgment (DE 71 ). Accordingly, Defendants are granted until 6/15/2018, to file a supplemental brief and any additional exhibits. Plain tiff is granted until 7/6/2018, to file a response brief and any exhibits. Defendants' reply will be due 14 days after service of Plaintiff's response. The court finds that in view of this order granting Plaintiff additional time to file a response, none of the motions set forth any basis for relief. Accordingly, Plaintiff's various motions ( 82 Motion for Order for Protection; 83 Motion for Order to Stop Tampering with Mail; 97 Motion for Pro Se Protection; 101 Motion to Hold/Stay All Orders; 105 Motion to Hold or Stay Orders; 106 Motion for Extension of Time; 107 Motion for Order to Show Cause and 112 Motion for Hearing) are DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [ 71] Joint Motion to Dismiss (DE 116 ) is GRANTED IN PART to the extent stated above. (Response deadline 7/6/2018.) Plaintiff is cautioned that no further extensions of time to respond to Defendants' motion will be granted. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 5/21/2018. Mailed to pro se party Anthony D. Williams at Devens FMC by regular mail. (mam)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 117 motion for order requiring all legal mail to be certified; or alternately, requiring prison personnel to open legal mail in plaintiff's presence and provide time-date stamp. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/23/2018. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (amh)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying 79 Motion for Leave to Engage in Discovery; finding as moot 89 Motion for Discovery; granting 92 Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is stayed until Judge Melgren has an opportunity to issue a ruling on plaintiff's Rule 56(d) motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/7/2017. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying without prejudice 80 and 84 motions for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/6/2017. Mailed to pro se party by regular mail. (amh)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 56 Motion for TRO; denying 56 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/13/2017.Mailed to pro se party Anthony D. Williams by regular mail (cm)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Amend the Amended Complaint 44 & 52 and his Motion for a Stay on All Proceedings Due to Retaliatory Transfer 57 are denied. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to F ile Answer 55 is granted, rendering Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time 51 moot. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead within sixty (60) days of this Order. Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, the Bureau of Prisons is to pro vide the Court with the last known addresses for Defendants Maye and Leonhard. The Clerk's Office shall issue summons to Shannon Phelps at FCI Beaumont Low, 5560 KNAUTH ROAD BEAUMONT, TX 77705, and to Glenna Crews at Bureau of Prisons, North Central Regional Office, 400 STATE AVENUE, SUITE 800, KANSAS CITY, KS 66101. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 07/11/17. Mailed to pro se party Anthony D. Williams and Bureau of Prisons by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Aulepp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Aulepp
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: David Clay Britton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Blevins
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: David Clay Britton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: David Clay Britton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Manily
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: David Clay Britton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Stanley
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: David Clay Britton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Witt
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: David Clay Britton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Herbig
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: David Clay Britton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Lionhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?