McCoy (ID 76894) v. Kansas Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: DeRon McCoy, Jr.
Defendant: Kansas Department of Corrections, Century Link, James Heimgartner, S. Peavler, Kelly Schidler, D. Dorsey and R.W. Sapien
Case Number: 5:2017cv03014
Filed: January 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint 26 is denied. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 02/28/18. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Plaintiff is granted to and including December 18, 2017, in which to show good cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 12/18/2017. The Court's previous order directing Defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading within 14 days of receipt of the amended Martinez report 23 is stayed at this time. Signed by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/17/2017. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (mls)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Count II of Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's claim that his constitutional rights were violated by the recording of certain calls t o his attorney is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon upon which relief can be granted. Defendants Sapien, Dorsey, Peavler, Kansas Department of Corrections and Century Link are dismissed from this action. The Clerk of the Court shall prepa re waiver of service forms for the remaining defendants. The Clerk of the Court shall enter the Kansas Department of Corrections as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez report. Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Summons and Waiver of Service Upon Defendants 9 is denied as moot. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/11/17. Mailed to pro se party DeRon McCoy, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy (ID 76894) v. Kansas Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeRon McCoy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Heimgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Peavler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Schidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.W. Sapien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?