Darnell v. Merchant et al
Petitioner: Bobbi Darnell
Respondent: John Merchant and Kickapoo Tribe in Kansas
Case Number: 5:2017cv03063
Filed: April 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Brown
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is denied. Petitioner's Renewed Request for Release on Recognizance Bond 25 is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 11/29/17. (smnd)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 12 Petitioner Darnell's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/16/2017. (byk)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - It is ordered that respondents are directed to respond to petitioner's request for immediate release on or before Monday, May 8, 2017, by 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/05/2017. (ses)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Respondent is required to show cause on or before May 15, 2017, why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner has until June 15, 2017, to file a traverse thereto. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/18/17. A copy of this order was e-mailed to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darnell v. Merchant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bobbi Darnell
Represented By: Napoleon S. Crews, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Merchant
Represented By: Wendell F. Cowan, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas G. Lemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kickapoo Tribe in Kansas
Represented By: Vincent M. Cox
Represented By: Thomas G. Lemon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?