Washburn (ID 82688) v. Saline County Jail
Plaintiff: Allen Dean Washburn
Defendant: Saline County Jail and Saline County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 5:2017cv03107
Filed: June 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Norton
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Presiding Judge: David J. Waxse
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim for relief. The failure to file a timely response may result in the dismissal of this action without additional prior notice to the plaintiff. Show Cause Response due by 3/6/2018. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 2/6/18. Mailed to pro se party Allen Dean Washburn by regular mail (msb)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel 3 is denied. The time for filing the Martinez report is set at December 18, 2017. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/17/17. Mailed to pro se party Allen Dean Washburn and Sheriff of Saline County by regular mail. (smnd)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is granted to and including August 17, 2017, to submit an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 07/17/17. Mailed to pro se party Allen Dean Washburn by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washburn (ID 82688) v. Saline County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Dean Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?