Washburn (ID 82688) v. Harvey County Jail
Plaintiff: |
Allen Dean Washburn |
Defendant: |
Harvey County Jail and Harvey County Sheriff's Department |
Case Number: |
5:2017cv03113 |
Filed: |
July 9, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Kansas |
Office: |
Topeka Office |
County: |
Norton |
Presiding Judge: |
Sam A. Crow |
Presiding Judge: |
David J. Waxse |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 29, 2019 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for copies of sealed exhibits 32 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion for production of video 34 is denied. Plaintiff is directed to show cause on or before Ap ril 29, 2019, why his claims alleging the denial of adequate medical and dental care and exposure to odor should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim for relief. Plaintiff is directed to provide an address to the Sheriff of Harvey County on or before April 20, 2019, for the disposal of his property. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/29/19. Mailed to pro se party Allen Dean Washburn by regular mail. (smnd)
|
November 8, 2017 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel 3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is granted to and including December 8, 2017, to file a second amended complaint. The failure to file a timely response may result in the dismissal of this matter without prejudice and without additional prior notice. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/08/17. Mailed to pro se party Allen Dean Washburn by regular mail. (smnd)
|
July 17, 2017 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is granted to and including August 17, 2017, to submit an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 07/17/17. Mailed to pro se party Allen Dean Washburn by regular mail. (smnd)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?