Garcia (ID 6002627) v. Shaw et al
Plaintiff: Ray Floyd Garcia, Jr.
Defendant: Susan A. Shaw, Malty J. Martin and William M. Van Scoter
Case Number: 5:2017cv03181
Filed: October 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: This action is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/20/18. Mailed to pro se party Ray Floyd Garcia, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted until February 28, 2018, in which to show good cause, in writing, to the Honorable Sam A. Crow, United States District Judge, why Plaintiff's Complaint should not be dismissed. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 01/31/18. Mailed to pro se party Ray Floyd Garcia, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted until December 12, 2017, in which to pay the remaining $395.00 of the filing fee in this case. The failure to submit the fee by that date will result in the dismissal of this matter without pr ejudice and without additional prior notice. Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 2 is denied without prejudice. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/28/17. Mailed to pro se party Ray Floyd Garcia, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia (ID 6002627) v. Shaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Floyd Garcia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan A. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malty J. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Van Scoter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?