McNeal v. Henry et al
Plaintiff: Floyd E. McNeal
Defendant: Terica Henry, Corrie L. Wright and Valeo Behavioral Health Care
Case Number: 5:2017cv04008
Filed: January 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
County: Shawnee
Presiding Judge: Daniel D. Crabtree
Presiding Judge: K. Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/9/18. (msb)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 18 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 8/1/17. (msb)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 7/18/17. (msb)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 5/30/17. (msb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Henry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd E. McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terica Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrie L. Wright
Represented By: Mary R. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeo Behavioral Health Care
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Leadstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?