Coffman v. Hutchinson Community College

Plaintiff: Dustin D. Coffman
Defendant: Hutchinson Community College, Jay Ballard, Kathy Sanchez, Debra Heckler, Cindy Hoss and Janet Hamilton
Case Number: 5:2017cv04070
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Topeka Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sam A. Crow
Referring Judge: Gwynne E. Birzer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Defendant Hutchinson Community College's Motion to Quash; granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. A ll defendants' deadlines to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint are extended to December 22, 2018. Plaintiff's deadline to achieve service on Ms. Sanchez is extended to December 21, 2017, and the US Marshal or deputy marshal shall undertake service of process on individual defendant Kathy Sanchez. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/29/17. Mailed to pro se party Dustin D. Coffman by regular mail. (sj)
October 23, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiff to demonstrate why the individual defendants have not been served with the summons and Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2017. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/23/17. Mailed to pro se party Dustin Coffman by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 1640 0000 9096 6357. (adc)
October 3, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion to Accept Statement of Facts Petition for 16.3 A.D.R.; denying 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Case (For Rule 5.6.4); denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion for 16.3 Alternative Dispute Resolutions. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/3/17. Mailed to pro se party Dustin D. Coffman by regular mail. (sj)
September 22, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: 26 Motion to Strike is denied. 21 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. See order for details. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 9/22/17. Mailed to pro se party Dustin D. Coffman by regular mail (msb)
September 8, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 3 Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel; denying 4 Plaintiff's motion for mediation; denying 5 Plaintiff's motion to accept petitions; denying 6 Plaintiff's motion for sealed document ation under Title 79.4; denying 9 Plaintiff's motion to make all exhibits and evidence for discovery to the defendants; denying 10 Plaintiff's motion for [amended] exhibit list for mediation or summary judgment brief order; and denying 11 Plaintiff's (amended) motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/7/18. Mailed to pro se party Dustin D. Coffman by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3320. (sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffman v. Hutchinson Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin D. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchinson Community College
Represented By: Carole K. DeWald
Represented By: Allen G. Glendenning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Heckler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Hoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?