Spurlock (ID 114673) v. Corizon Health et al

Plaintiff: James Allen Spurlock
Defendant: Dennis Kepka, Julie Patterson, Corizon Health, Mable Walker, (fnu) Pruitt, William Wade, (fnu) Morrison, Gordon Harrod, Correct Care Solutions, Tim Taylor, Vicky Lanter, Tony Rusch, Janet Hayes and Marty Sauers
Case Number: 5:2018cv03275
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff's response deadline is extended to 1/31/2019. Plaintiff's #8 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 1/4/2019. Mailed to pro se party James Allen Spurlock by regular mail. (ht)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff James Allen Spurlock (smnd)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 Order by Plaintiff James Allen Spurlock (smnd)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel #3 is denied without prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 01/02/19. Mailed to pro se party James Allen Spurlock by regular mail. (smnd)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ENTERED: The court directs plaintiff to show cause by January 10, 2019, why plaintiff's official capacity claims against all defendants and plaintiff's individual capacity claims against defendant Hays, defendant Wade, defendant Morrison, and defendant CCS should not be dismissed. The court directs the Clerk of the Court to prepare waiver of service forms for the following defendants: Corizon Health; Gordon Harrod; Dennis Kepka; Tony Rusch; Vicky Lanter; Mable Walker; Julie Patterson; Martin Sauers; Tim Taylor; and FNU Pruitt. Plaintiff bears the primary responsibility to provide sufficient address information for service of process or waivers of process upon each defendant. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/19/18. Mailed to pro se party James Allen Spurlock by regular mail. (smnd)
December 6, 2018 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 12/6/2018. Receipt number T4631012353, in the amount of $ 5.00. (mls)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $5.00 calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days from receipt of this order to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/14/18. Mailed to pro se party James Allen Spurlock by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff James Allen Spurlock (smnd)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James Allen Spurlock (Attachments: #1 Form 9 & Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff James Allen Spurlock (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Glossary and Exhibits 1-30; #2 Summons) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurlock (ID 114673) v. Corizon Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Kepka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mable Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Harrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Lanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Rusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Sauers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allen Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?