Bell v. English et al

Plaintiff: Steven Bell
Defendant: Donald Ratz, A. Helm and N. C. English
Case Number: 5:2018cv03276
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2018 16 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to #15 Memorandum and Order, entered on 12/28/2018, this matter is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/28/2018. Mailed to Plaintiff Steven Bell by regular mail. (ht)
December 28, 2018 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this case is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/28/2018. Mailed to Plaintiff Steven Bell by regular mail. (ht)
December 10, 2018 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 12/10/2018. Receipt number T4631012378, in the amount of $ 22.50. Money order received in the amount of $45.00 total. Remainder applied to filing fee balance. (jal)
December 4, 2018 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion seeking an expedited preliminary injunction #3 is denied. Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Petition #6 is granted. Plaintiff is granted until December 21, 2018, in which to show good cause, in writing, to the Honorable Sam A. Crow, United States District Judge, why Plaintiff's Complaint should not be dismissed. Plaintiff is also granted until December 21, 2018, in which to file a complete and proper amended complaint to cure all the deficiencies. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/04/18. Mailed to pro se party Steven Andrew Bell by regular mail. (smnd)
December 4, 2018 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Steven Bell: now at 1005 NE Jefferson Avenue, Peoria, Illinois 60613 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
December 3, 2018 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of executed Summons upon United States Attorney General via certified mail on 11/26/18 (smnd)
November 29, 2018 7 RESPONSE by Defendants N. C. English, A. Helm, Donald Ratz re #3 MOTION for Orders (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, Declaration of A. Heim, #2 Atachment 2, Declaration of J. Dyer, #3 Exhibit List)(Jacobs, Michelle)
November 27, 2018 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of executed Summons upon United States Attorney via personal service on 11/21/18 (smnd)
November 26, 2018 11 Summons Returned Executed by certified mail upon Defendant A. Helm; served on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019 (smnd)
November 26, 2018 10 Summons Returned Executed by certified mail upon Defendant Donald Ratz; served on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019 (smnd)
November 26, 2018 9 Summons Returned Executed by certified mail upon Defendant N.C. English; served on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/18/2019 (smnd)
November 21, 2018 6 MOTION to Modify by Plaintiff Steven Bell (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
November 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendants N. C. English, A. Helm, Donald Ratz, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service) (smnd)
November 14, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER ENTERED: The Clerk of Court shall effectuate service of summonses pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i) at no cost to Plaintiff. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's motion for an expedited preliminary injunction at Doc. #3 by November 30, 2018. Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/14/18. Mailed to pro se party Steven Bell by regular mail. (smnd)
November 14, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $22.50, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days from receipt of this order to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/14/18. Mailed to pro se party Steven Bell by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
November 8, 2018 3 MOTION for Orders by Plaintiff Steven Bell (smnd)
November 8, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Steven Bell (smnd)
November 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Steven Bell (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. English et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Ratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Helm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. C. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?