Williams v. United States of America et al.

Petitioner: Onta Williams
Respondent: United States of America and Nicole English
Case Number: 5:2018cv03291
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's response #9 to the Court's ruling on his motion to alter or amend judgment is considered and denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/31/19. Mailed to pro se party Onta Williams by regular mail. (smnd)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Petitioner Onta Williams re #8 Order (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion to alter or amend judgment #7 is denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/16/19. Mailed to pro se party Onta Williams by regular mail. (smnd) Modified text to correct district judge on 1/16/2019 (smnd)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment by Petitioner Onta Williams (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order #5 dismissing petition. ***Terminating Case. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 01/03/19. Mailed to pro se party Onta Williams by regular mail. (smnd)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The petition is dismissed for lack of statutory jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/03/19. Mailed to pro se party Onta Williams by regular mail. (smnd)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (on court-approved form) filed by Petitioner Onta Williams (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (on court-approved form) filed by Petitioner Onta Williams (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mailed to pro se party Onta Williams by regular mail. Response deadline 1/7/2019. (smnd)
December 7, 2018 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $5.00, receipt number T4631012376 (smnd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Onta Williams (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United States of America et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nicole English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Onta Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?