Gray v. Hilton
Petitioner: Ronald Adrin Gray
Respondent: Dawn Hilton
Case Number: 5:2018cv03305
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan S. Jeffress for Ronald Adrin Gray pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/4/2019. (sz)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shawn Nolan for Ronald Adrin Gray pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/4/2019. (sz)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Jonathan Jeffress to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4674435.) by Petitioner Ronald Adrin Gray (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bath, Thomas)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Shawn Nolan re #5 MOTION for attorney Shawn Nolan to appear pro hac vice by Petitioner Ronald Adrin Gray(Bath, Thomas)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Timothy P. Kane for Ronald Adrin Gray pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/2/2019. (sz)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Shawn Nolan to appear pro hac vice by Petitioner Ronald Adrin Gray (Bath, Thomas)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Jonathan S. Jeffress to appear pro hac vice by Petitioner Ronald Adrin Gray (Bath, Thomas) (PLEASE DISREGARD - COUNSEL CALLED AND WILL REFILE CORRECTLY) (mls).
December 31, 2018 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jared S. Maag on behalf of Dawn Hilton. (Maag, Jared)
December 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney Kane, Timothy to appear pro hac vice by Petitioner Ronald Adrin Gray (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bath, Thomas)
December 31, 2018 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $5.00, receipt number T4631012428 (smnd)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Ronald Adrin Gray (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List; #2 Exhibits 1-29; #3 Exhibits 30-59; #4 Exhibits 60-75; #5 Exhibits 76-107) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gray v. Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald Adrin Gray
Represented By: Timothy P. Kane
Represented By: Jonathan S. Jeffress
Represented By: Thomas J. Bath, Jr.
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dawn Hilton
Represented By: Jared S. Maag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?