White et al v. Azria Health of Olathe Kansas et al
Plaintiff: Kayla D. White, Vancile Aurthur White, Jr., Dorothy Mae White and Vancile Arthur White, Jr.
Defendant: David C. Kirk, Patricia Nix, Patricia Lincoln, Azria Health of Olathe Kansas, Freedom Behavioral Hospital and David C. Kurt
Case Number: 5:2018cv04142
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #33 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Defendant Patricia Lincoln's Motion for More Definite Statement). The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 23, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #33 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Defendant Patricia Lincoln's Motion for More Definite Statement) by Defendant Patricia Lincoln(Hofer, Scott)
January 23, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Defendant Patricia Lincoln's Motion for More Definite Statement) by Defendant Patricia Lincoln (Hofer, Scott)
January 23, 2019 Filing 32 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robert H. Houske on behalf of Patricia Lincoln. (Houske, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 31 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #30 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Defendant David C. Kurt Exhibit 1. (Lawson, Corliss)
January 17, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #29 MOTION to Dismiss Party David B. Kurt former Director for East Region KS DCF by Defendant David C. Kurt(Lawson, Corliss)
January 17, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Party David B. Kurt former Director for East Region KS DCF by Defendant David C. Kurt (Lawson, Corliss)
January 10, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #27 MOTION to Dismiss Party Azria Health of Olathe by Defendant Azria Health of Olathe Kansas(Merrill, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Party Azria Health of Olathe by Defendant Azria Health of Olathe Kansas (Merrill, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for More Definite Statement . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ss)
January 10, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant David C. Kirk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Church, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response deadline 1/31/2019), MOTION for More Definite Statement ( Response deadline 1/24/2019) by Defendant David C. Kirk (Church, Daniel)
January 10, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Patricia Nix by Defendant Patricia Nix (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Merrill, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Party Patricia Nix by Defendant Patricia Nix (Merrill, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 22 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/23/2019 for Defendant Patricia Lincoln to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/9/2019. Mailed to pro se parties Vancile Aurthur White, Jr., Dorothy Mae White and Kayla D. White by regular mail. (jal)
January 9, 2019 Filing 21 (PLEASE DISREGARD - INCORRECTLY FILED) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respond as to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Patricia Lincoln (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Hofer, Scott) (mls).
January 3, 2019 Filing 20 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 1/23/2019 for Defendant David C. Kurt to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/3/2019. Mailed to pro se party Vancile Arthur White, Jr., Dorothy Mae White and Kayla D. White by regular mail. (jal)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail upon Patricia Nix served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (jal)
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail upon David C. Kirk served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (jal)
December 27, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail upon Freedom Behavioral Hospital served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (jal)
December 27, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail upon David C. Kurt served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (jal)
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail upon Azria Health of Olathe Kansas served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (jal)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by certified mail upon Patricia Lincoln served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019 (msb)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER overruling #11 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge and affirming Magistrate Judge O'Hara's order #6 . Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 12/20/2018. Mailed to pro se parties Dorothy, Kayla, and Vancile White by regular mail. (mls)
December 17, 2018 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to #11 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge re #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Vancile Aurthur White, Jr. (mls)
December 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (issued to US Marshal for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry). (jal)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge re #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Plaintiff Vancile Arthur White, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Photo Exhibits) (mls) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct name (jal).
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Vancile Arthur White, Jr., Dorothy Mae White, and Kayla D. White, providing the addresses of defendants, re #5 Order. (mls) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct name (jal).
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 Order on Motion for Leave in forma pauperis addressed to Dorothy Mae White. (ydm) Modified on 12/11/2018 to link document to Doc #5 instead of Doc #6.(ydm)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed to Vancile Arthur White Jr. (ydm)Modified on 12/11/2018 to link document to Doc #5 instead of Doc #6. (ydm)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed to Kayla D. White. (ydm) Modified on 12/11/2018 to link document to Doc #5 instead of Doc #6.(ydm)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiffs are hereby informed that, within 14 days after they are served with a copy of this order, they may, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D. Kan. Rule 72.1.4(a), file written objections to this order by filing a motion requesting that the presiding U.S. district judge review this order. A party must file any objections within the 14-day period if the party wants to have appellate review of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/27/2018. Mailed to pro se party Dorothy White, Vancile White and Kayla White by regular mail. (ydm)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/27/2018.Mailed to pro se party Dorothy Mae White, Vancile Arthur White, Jr. and Kayla D. White. by regular mail and certified mail ; Certified Tracking Numbers: 70150920000170458416, 70150920000170458423 and 70161970000113655774. (ydm) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct name (jal).
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiffs Dorothy Mae White, Kayla D. White, Vancile Arthur White, Jr (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (jal) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct name (jal).
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Vancile Arthur White, Jr (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit, #2 Financial Affidavit Exhibits)(jal) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct name (jal).
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Dorothy Mae White, Kayla D. White, Vancile Arthur White, Jr. (jal) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct name (jal).
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Vancile Arthur White, Jr, Kayla D. White, Dorothy Mae White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(jal) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct name(jal).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Azria Health of Olathe Kansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Kirk
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Nix
Represented By: Matthew M. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lincoln
Represented By: Robert H. Houske
Represented By: Scott D. Hofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azria Health of Olathe Kansas
Represented By: Matthew M. Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Behavioral Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Kurt
Represented By: Corliss Scroggins Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla D. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vancile Aurthur White, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Mae White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vancile Arthur White, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?