Gentry v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Christopher Chad Gentry and Chad
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 5:2018cv04144
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #10 Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Beall, Thomas)
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time as to #10 Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief by Defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Beall, Thomas)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Personal Service on 1/28/2019. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. Summons served on United States Attorney. (jal)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF'S SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF by Christopher Chad Gentry. (mls)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to File Evidence Conventionally. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 1/10/2019. Mailed to pro se party Christopher Chad Gentry by regular mail. (hl)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed via Certified Mail (USM-285) on 12/31/2018. Summons served on United States Attorney General. (jal)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION FOR LEAVE to file audio file evidence conventionally by Plaintiff Christopher Chad Gentry. (mls)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of summons - served Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration on 12/21/2018 by certified mail. (mls)
December 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). (mls)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re 4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, addressed to Christopher Chad Gentry. (hl)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on December 11, 2018. Mailed to pro se party Christopher Chad Gentry by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3460 0000 8262 9970 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rs)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher Chad Gentry. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (mls)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher Chad Gentry. (mls)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by Christopher Chad Gentry. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibits) (mls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Chad Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?