Kraft v. Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lane Erin Kraft
Defendant: Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv04148
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail (USM-285) by Lane Erin Kraft upon Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc. served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (jal)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Adam M. Teel on behalf of Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc.. (Teel, Adam)
January 24, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Lane Erin Kraft is a registered pro se participant who will receive electronic notification in this case. (mg)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN regular mail received: Re Summons Issued addressed to Lane Erin Kraft. Not remailed (msb)
January 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc. (issued to US Marshal for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jal)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Lane Erin Kraft re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, with address for Defendant. (ht)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If not previously provided, plaintiff is directed to provide the address of the named defendant by no later than January 3, 2019, so that the Clerk of the Court may proceed with service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 12/20/18. Mailed to pro se party Lane Erin Kraft by regular mail. (hw)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Lane Erin Kraft(referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachment: #1 Financial Affidavit)(msb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET: Re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Lane Erin Kraft. (msb)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka filed by Lane Erin Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Complaint, #2 Right to Sue Letter)(msb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraft v. Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane Erin Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underground Vaults & Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Adam M. Teel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?