Page v. Commandant
Petitioner: Jeffery T. Page
Respondent: Commandant
Case Number: 5:2019cv03020
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERED: Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #5 is granted. Respondent is required to show cause on or before May 15, 2019, why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner is granted until June 17, 2019, to file a traverse thereto. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/13/19. (smnd)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Return as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Commandant (Morehead, Terra)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Respondent is required to show cause on or before March 14, 2019, why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner has until April 15, 2019, to file a traverse thereto. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/13/19. Copies of this order transmitted to the parties and the U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas. (smnd) Modified text on 2/13/2019 (smnd)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John N. Maher for petitioner Jeffery T. Page pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/12/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for attorney John N. Maher to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4710145.) by Petitioner Jeffery T. Page (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Joseph, Christopher)
February 11, 2019 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $5.00, receipt number T4631012558 (smnd)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Jeffery T. Page (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Commandant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commandant
Represented By: Terra D. Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffery T. Page
Represented By: Diane L. Bellquist
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joseph
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Parker
Represented By: John N. Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?