Mixon v. Ottawa County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Edward Mixon
Defendant: John (lnu), Ottawa County Detention Center and (fnu) Coleman
Case Number: 5:2019cv03032
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Joseph Edward Mixon (smnd)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Amend #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Joseph Edward Mixon (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Shomaker; #2 Envelope) (smnd)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Joseph Edward Mixon: now at Saline County Jail, P.O. Box 1606, Salina, Kansas 67401 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Joseph Edward Mixon: now at McPherson County Jail, 1177 W. Woodside, McPherson, Kansas 67460 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
March 29, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 3/29/2019. Receipt number W4631018130, in the amount of $ 12.00. (jk)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN mail received re 3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed to Joseph Edward Mixon (Return to Sender/Refused/Unable to Forward); Remailed to Plaintiff Nixon at Saline County Jail (smnd)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Joseph Edward Mixon: now at Saline County Jail, P.O. Box 1606, Salina, Kansas 67401 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (requested forms and docket sheet mailed to plaintiff) (smnd)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $12.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days from receipt of this order to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/06/19. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Edward Mixon by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Edward Mixon (Attachments: #1 Inmate Bank Transaction List) (smnd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Joseph Edward Mixon (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mixon v. Ottawa County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ottawa County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Edward Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?