Bradin v. Thomas et al
Petitioner: John Bradin
Respondent: Linda Thomas and United States Board of Probation & Parole
Case Number: 5:2019cv03041
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERED: Respondent is required to show cause on or before April 19, 2019, why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner is granted until May 20, 2019, to file a traverse thereto. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #3 is granted. Respondents shall have until April 8, 2019, to respond to Petitioner's Motion for Subpoena #4 and Motion for Release of Seized Assets #5 . Petitioner shall have until April 19, 2019, to file a reply. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/19/19. Mailed to pro se party John Bradin by regular mail; e-mailed to U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas. (smnd)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 Letter to Clerk of the Court from Petitioner John Bradin (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction by Petitioner John Bradin (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and MOTION for Emergency Hearing by Petitioner John Bradin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order; #2 Envelope) (smnd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Release of Seized Assets for Hiring Counsel of Choice by Petitioner John Bradin (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (smnd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Subpoena by Petitioner John Bradin (smnd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner John Bradin (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUGGESTIONS AND POINTS OF LAW IN SUPPORT of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner John Bradin (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G) (smnd)
March 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner John Bradin (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradin v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Bradin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Linda Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Board of Probation & Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?