Strader (ID 66677) v. Werholtz et al
Plaintiff: James C. Strader
Defendant: Sam Cline, Roger Werholtz, Kansas Department of Corrections, Corizon and (fnu) Shuber
Case Number: 5:2019cv03102
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 Letter to Clerk's Office from Plaintiff James C. Strader; pages 20-33 are only half visible. (smnd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 Letter to Clerk's Office from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
August 5, 2019 Filing 24 Letter to Clerk's Office from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 Letter to Clerk's Office from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (jal)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 Letter to Clerk's Office from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 Letter to Clerk's Office from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Hearing and Notice to the Court by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kansas Department of Corrections for Plaintiff James C. Strader, #66677: now at Lansing Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2, Lansing, Kansas 66043. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Orders by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 Letter to Clerk's Office from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to Clerk's Office from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION FOR LEAVE to File All Pleadings Conventionally by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiff James C. Strader re: filing conventionally (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees #2 & #8 are granted because plaintiff's trust fund account statement shows that he has insufficient funds to pay an initial partial filing fee. Notwithstanding this grant of leave, plaintiff is required to pay the full amount of the filing fee and is hereby assessed $350.00. Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from the prisoner's account to the clerk of the court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the filing fees are paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 07/08/19. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to All Staff by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk's Office and Judge Crow, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT (rough draft of e-file) filed by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #5 MOTION for Order by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
June 28, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A Motion for Order #5 was filed conventionally by Plaintiff James C. Strader on June 27, 2019. Notice was sent to Plaintiff Strader advising that he is incarcerated in a facility with mandatory electronic filing and should follow instructions available at the facility for transmitting pleadings electronically to the court. (smnd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ENTERED: On or before July 12, 2019, plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint as directed. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/14/19. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. Response deadline 7/12/2019. (smnd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Information and Instructions for Prisoners Filing Civil Rights Complaints.) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strader (ID 66677) v. Werholtz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Strader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Werholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?