Dale v. Fletcher et al
Plaintiff: Sean C. Dale
Defendant: Aramark Corporation and Mary Fletcher
Case Number: 5:2019cv03240
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sean C. Dale re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Aramark Corporation, Mary Fletcher re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Rupe, Alan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Sean C. Dale re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(smnd)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Aramark Corporation, Mary Fletcher (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of ARAMARK Dietician)(Rupe, Alan)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response deadline 1/6/2020) by Defendants Aramark Corporation, Mary Fletcher (Rupe, Alan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until December 16, 2019, for Defendants Aramark Corporation and Mary Fletcher to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/02/19. Mailed to pro se party Sean C. Dale by regular mail. (smnd)
November 22, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: #1 Notice of Removal originally filed as Case No. 19-4112; reassigned as 555 Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition). (smnd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Aramark Corporation, Mary Fletcher of Notice of Removal and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Rupe, Alan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aramark Corporation (Rupe, Alan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Aramark Corporation, Mary Fletcher. (Rupe, Alan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Aramark Corporation, Mary Fletcher - trial to be held in Topeka. (Rupe, Alan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from Shawnee County District Court. (Rupe, Alan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Aramark Corporation, Mary Fletcher. (Rupe, Alan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Shawnee County District Court, case number 2019-cv-000762 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4990020.), filed by Aramark Corporation, Mary Fletcher.(Rupe, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale v. Fletcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Corporation
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Fletcher
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean C. Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?