Hunter v. Bugg et al

Plaintiff: Robert L Hunter
Defendant: David Kellett, Verdell E. Bugg, Earlene E. Bugg and Peoples Insurance Group
Case Number: 5:2019cv04011
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail (USM-285) of Amended Complaint by Robert L Hunter upon Verdell E. Bugg served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (jal)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Kellett's Motion and Suggestions to Dismiss Without Prejudie for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by David Kellett. (Beckerman, Dale)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Suggestions in Support by Defendant David Kellett (Beckerman, Dale)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #9 Answer to Amended Complaint ("Responding to Verdell E. Bugg and Earlene E. Bugg Denial of Breach of Contract and Punitive Damages") by Plaintiff Robert L Hunter. (mls)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail (USM-285) by Robert L Hunter upon David Kellett served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (jal)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail (USM-285) by Robert L Hunter upon Peoples Insurance Group served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (jal)
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED via Certified Mail (USM-285) by Robert L Hunter upon Earlene E. Bugg served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (jal)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Earlene E. Bugg, Verdell E. Bugg.(Blumreich, Craig)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Craig C. Blumreich on behalf of Earlene E. Bugg, Verdell E. Bugg (Blumreich, Craig)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified (USM-285) by Robert L Hunter upon David Kellett served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (jal)
March 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED on Amended Complaint as to Earlene E. Bugg, Verdell E. Bugg, David Kellett, and Peoples Insurance Group. (issued to US Marshal for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jal)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robert L Hunter. (mls)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail upon Verdell E. Bugg, served on 3/9/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (mls)
February 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verdell E. Bugg and David Kellett. (issued to US Marshal for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry). (jal)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 02/19/2019. Mailed to pro se party by regular and certified mail. (jc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert L Hunter. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit) (jal)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Robert L Hunter. (jal)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Robert L Hunter. (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Bugg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kellett
Represented By: Dale L. Beckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verdell E. Bugg
Represented By: Craig C. Blumreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earlene E. Bugg
Represented By: Craig C. Blumreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoples Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?