Wade v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Joy Wade
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Counter Defendant: Mark McMullen, Sherry Kittridge, Marcy DeWitt and Vivian Hays
Case Number: 5:2019cv04014
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Bankers Life and Casualty Company upon Marcy DeWitt served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019 (Otto, Theresa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Bankers Life and Casualty Company upon Sherry Kittridge served on 4/13/2019, answer due 5/6/2019 (Otto, Theresa)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Joy Wade.(Pugh, Jacob)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jacob R. Pugh on behalf of Joy Wade (Pugh, Jacob)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Bankers Life and Casualty Company upon Mark McMullen served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019 (Otto, Theresa)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Bankers Life and Casualty Company upon Vivian Hays served on 3/17/2019, answer due 4/8/2019 (Otto, Theresa)
March 7, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marcy DeWitt, Vivian Hays, Sherry Kittridge, and Mark McMullen. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jal)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Additional Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Joy Wade by Bankers Life and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Otto, Theresa) (Main Document 7 unsigned. Replaced with signed document on 3/7/2019) (jal).
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bankers Life and Casualty Company identifying CNO Financial Group as corporate parent . (Otto, Theresa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal by Bankers Life and Casualty Company (Otto, Theresa)
March 1, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - The Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal is missing. The filing attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Bankers Life and Casualty Company - trial to be held in Topeka. (Otto, Theresa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Bankers Life and Casualty Company. (Otto, Theresa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Osage County, Kansas, case number 2019-CV-000011 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4727902.), filed by Bankers Life and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Otto, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Westering
Represented By: Theresa A. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Wade
Represented By: Jacob R. Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Mark McMullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Sherry Kittridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Marcy DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Vivian Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?