H&S Logistics, LLC v. C.B. Asphalt, Inc.
Plaintiff: H&S Logistics, LLC
Defendant: C.B. Asphalt, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04019
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by John J. Gates (Gates, John)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Court directs that this case be stayed pending first mediation and, if mediation is unsuccessful,then arbitration of the claims in this case. A status report is directed as described in order. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 4/23/19. (msb)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #6 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant C.B. Asphalt, Inc.(Gates, John)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Plaintiff H&S Logistics, LLC re #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Puckett, J.)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant C.B. Asphalt, Inc. is required to show good cause in writing to District Judge Sam A. Crow, on or before April 17, 2019, why the Court should not remand this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/2/2019. (ts)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant C.B. Asphalt, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gates, John)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Removal by C.B. ASPHALT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gates, John) Modified on 3/20/2019 to restrict incorrectly attached exhibit. (jal)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant C.B. ASPHALT, INC. - trial to be held in Topeka. (Gates, John)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant C.B. ASPHALT, INC.. (Gates, John)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saline County, case number 2019-cv-000054 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4746446.), filed by C.B. ASPHALT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Gates, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H&S Logistics, LLC v. C.B. Asphalt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&S Logistics, LLC
Represented By: J. Nick Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.B. Asphalt, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?