BNSF Railway Company et al v. Kansas Department of Revenue, State of Kansas

Plaintiff: South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The, Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The, Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company, Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company, Kaw River Railroad, LLC, BNSF Railway Company, Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, Inc., Cimarron Valley Railroad, LC, Kansas City Terminal Railway Company and Kyle Railroad Company
Defendant: Kansas Department of Revenue, State of Kansas
Case Number: 5:2019cv04034
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:11503
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by BNSF Railway Company, Cimarron Valley Railroad, LC, Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, Inc., Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The, Kansas City Terminal Railway Company, Kaw River Railroad, LLC, Kyle Railroad Company, Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The, Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company. (Alderson, Alan)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER enjoining Assessment, Levy and Collection of Discriminatory Taxes. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 5/29/2019. (md)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Shelley M. Woodard on behalf of All Defendants. (Woodard, Shelley)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. District Judge Sam A. Crow no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/16/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
May 16, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ctv)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs BNSF Railway Company, Cimarron Valley Railroad, LC, Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, Inc., Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The, Kansas City Terminal Railway Company, Kaw River Railroad, LLC, Kyle Railroad Company, Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The, Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company - trial to be held in Topeka. (Alderson, Alan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs BNSF Railway Company, Cimarron Valley Railroad, LC, Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, Inc., Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The, Kansas City Terminal Railway Company, Kaw River Railroad, LLC, Kyle Railroad Company, Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The, Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company. (Alderson, Alan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4808579.), filed by Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet, Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company, Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The, Kaw River Railroad, LLC, Cimarron Valley Railroad, LC, South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, BNSF Railway Company, Kansas City Terminal Railway Company, Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company, St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The, Kyle Railroad Company.(Weiler, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company et al v. Kansas Department of Revenue, State of Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaw River Railroad, LLC
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, Inc.
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cimarron Valley Railroad, LC
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas City Terminal Railway Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Railroad Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department of Revenue, State of Kansas
Represented By: Shelley M. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?