The Hanor Company of Wisconsin, LLC v. Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Hanor Company of Wisconsin, LLC
Defendant: Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04039
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 JUDGMENT ENTERED: Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 9) shall be granted. Action dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/16/19. (msb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. See order for details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 7/16/19. (msb)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 01:30 PM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 7/23/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/6/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 8/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 7/10/2019. (ht)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc. re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Patterson, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Plaintiff The Hanor Company of Wisconsin, LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Phillips, Carrie)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff The Hanor Company of Wisconsin, LLC - trial to be held in Kansas City. (May, Kirk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Hanor Company of Wisconsin, LLC identifying HK USA Holdings, Inc. and Kronseder Farms, Inc. as corporate parent (May, Kirk)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James J. Crongeyer, Jr for Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 05/28/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ctv)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc.. Amendment to #5 MOTION for attorney James J. Crongeyer, Jr. to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4813106.) Amended Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Patterson, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A)(Patterson, John)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc. (Patterson, John)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James M. Tyrone for Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 05/23/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ctv)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc.. Amendment to #6 MOTION for attorney James M. Tyrone to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4813114.) Amended Affidavit of James M. Tyrone. (Patterson, John)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Paragraph 9 of the affidavits submitted by attorneys James J. Crongeyer, Jr. and James M. Tyrone in support of ECF No. #5 and ECF No. #6 do not comply with D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4. Further, Mr. Crongeyer's affidavit does not appear to list all bars, including federal bars, to which he is admitted. The court directs local counsel to file amended affidavits with the clerk's office by May 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/23/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney James M. Tyrone to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4813114.) by Defendant Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Patterson, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney James J. Crongeyer, Jr. to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4813106.) by Defendant Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Patterson, John)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ctv)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc. - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Patterson, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc. . (Patterson, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc.. (Patterson, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Shawnee County, case number 19cv-000301 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4811075.), filed by Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Patterson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hanor Company of Wisconsin, LLC v. Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc.
Represented By: John E. Patterson
Represented By: James M. Tyrone
Represented By: James J. Crongeyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hanor Company of Wisconsin, LLC
Represented By: Carrie Phillips
Represented By: Kirk T. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?