Dicroce v. Hills Pet Nutrition Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kristin Dicroce
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition Inc. and Colgate Palmolive
Case Number: 5:2019cv04054
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from the Clerk regarding association with the MDL Proceeding In re: Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc., Dog Food Products Liability Litigation, Case No: 19-md-2887-JAR/TJJ. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Policy and Procedure Order, #2 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines) (gw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - The following case shall be deemed included in the MDL for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings in accordance with the Court's June 7, 2019 Preliminary Practice and Procedure Order Upon Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407(A), as modified the Court's June 11, 2019 Order Amending Initial Scheduling Conference Date and Other Deadlines: Dicroce v. Hill's Pet Nutrition, Inc. and Colgate-Palmolive Company, D. Kan., Case No. 19-cv-4054-JAR-TJJ. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 07/11/2019. (ses)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Agreeing to Transfer by Colgate Palmolive, Hills Pet Nutrition Inc.. (Schult, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer B. Wieland on behalf of Colgate Palmolive, Hills Pet Nutrition Inc. (Wieland, Jennifer)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Thomas P. Schult on behalf of Colgate Palmolive, Hills Pet Nutrition Inc. (Schult, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED BY THE COURT that pursuant to Local Rule 23-A,the parties shall file any notice of related case, or a stipulation agreeing to transfer signed by all parties, no later than seven calendar days from the date of this Order, or by July 17, 2019. The parties only need file any notice of related case or stipulation in this individual action. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/10/2019. (bw)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Request of Place of Trial by Kristin Dicroce (Van Dyk, Dustin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Kristin Dicroce. (Van Dyk, Dustin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4857635.), filed by Kristin Dicroce.(Van Dyk, Dustin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicroce v. Hills Pet Nutrition Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Dicroce
Represented By: Dustin L. Van Dyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hills Pet Nutrition Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate Palmolive
Represented By: Jennifer B. Wieland
Represented By: Thomas P. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?